EP1832275 - Hair styling compositions containing a silicone elastomer and a non-aqueous polar solvent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, Rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Singer, Jim M. 120 Connett Place South Orange, NJ 07079 / US | 02 /
Baek, Jisook 420 Mc Kinley Court Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Dossmann, Gérard, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | Dossmann, Gérard, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/13] | Bulle, Françoise Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | Bulle, Françoise Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07300841.9 | 01.03.2007 | [2007/37] | Priority number, date | US20060779132P | 03.03.2006 Original published format: US 779132 P | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1832275 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1832275 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/34, A61K8/895, A61Q5/06 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
A61Q5/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/8176 (EP,US);
A61K8/895 (EP,US);
A61K2800/594 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Title | German: | Hair-Styling-Zusammensetzungen mit einem Silikon-Elastomer und einem nichtwässrigen, polaren Lösungsmittel | [2007/37] | English: | Hair styling compositions containing a silicone elastomer and a non-aqueous polar solvent | [2007/37] | French: | Compositions pour coiffure contenant un élastomère en silicone et un solvant polaire non aqueux | [2007/37] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 20.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/18] | 17.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1792640 (WELLA AG [DE]) [E] 1-32 * claims 1,3,8-13 * * pages 3-4, paragraphs 7-11 * * page 4 * * pages 6-8, paragraphs 25-37 * * pages 11-12; examples 1-3 *; | [X]JP2003342130 (SHISEIDO CO LTD) [X] 1-32 * abstract *; | [X]JP2001097831 (LION CORP) [X] 1-32 * abstract *; | [X]JP2003040740 (LION CORP) [X] 1-32 * abstract *; | [X]WO9963952 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-32 * claims 1,2,4,9,16,17 * * page 1, lines 6-19 * * pages 29-30; examples A-G * * page 32; examples A,F *; | [X]EP1481660 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-9,13-25,29-32 * claims 11,12,16,25,26 * * pages 47-48; example 60 *; | [X]EP1314415 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-32 * claims 9,10,13,15,16,18-22,29,32 * * page 2, paragraphs 1,6 * * page 5, paragraph 27 * * page 7, paragraph 55 * * page 17, paragraph 92; example 16 *; | [X]EP1437119 (LION CORP [JP]) [X] 1-32 * pages 16-17; examples 26,27 * * page 2, paragraph 2 *; | [XA]EP1493421 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1 * claims 1,14-16,20,23,24,27 * [A] 2-32 |