EP2026259 - Method of managing the organisation of meetings between people having different terminals, for an IMS network core, and associated application server [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maag, Maria Laura Route de Nozay 91460 MARCOUSSIS / FR | 02 /
Robinson, Julien 51 Avenue Raymond Croland 92530 Le Plessis-Robinson / FR | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2012/29] | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Intellectual Property & Standards 32 Avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2012/10] | Nicolle, Olivier, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2009/49] | Hedarchet, Stéphane Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/08] | Hedarchet, Stéphane Compagnie Financiere Alcatel-Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07301300.5 | 09.08.2007 | [2009/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2026259 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
G06Q10/109 (EP);
H04L65/1016 (EP);
H04L65/403 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Organisationsverwaltung von Konferenzen zwischen Personen, die über heterogene Endgeräte verfügen, für ein IMS-Netz und den dazugehörigen Anwendungsserver | [2009/08] | English: | Method of managing the organisation of meetings between people having different terminals, for an IMS network core, and associated application server | [2009/08] | French: | Procédé de gestion d'organisation de réunions entre personnes disposant de terminaux hétérogènes, pour un coeur de réseau IMS, et serveur d'application associé | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 05.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.06.2018 | 22.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/41] | 01.06.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/41] | 06.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6898569 (BANSAL PRADEEP K [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]US2006069686 (BEYDA WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 1, paragraph 22 - page 6, paragraph 66 ** figure - *; | [X]EP1744270 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1-11 * column 3, line 11 - column 10, line 40 * * figure - * | Examination | US5963913 | WO0137541 | US2007177580 |