EP1908967 - Device for attaching a cable in a support plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dura Automotive Systems SAS 14, Parc Burospace Route de Gisy 91570 Bièvres / FR | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pradier, Philippe 17 Rue Sainte Barbe 42290 Sorbiers / FR | 02 /
Mathais, Patrick 85 Rue Jean Baptiste David 42100 Saint-Etienne / FR | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Thivillier, Patrick, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras 3 Place de l'Hôtel de Ville B.P. 203 42005 Saint-Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Thivillier, Patrick, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras, 3 Place de l'Hôtel de Ville, B.P. 203 42005 Saint-Etienne Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07301427.6 | 03.10.2007 | [2008/15] | Priority number, date | FR20060054097 | 05.10.2006 Original published format: FR 0654097 | [2008/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1908967 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1908967 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16C1/26 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
F16C1/262 (EP);
F16C1/105 (EP);
F16C2226/74 (EP);
F16C2326/20 (EP);
F16C2361/65 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Befestigen eines Kabels auf einer Halteplatine | [2008/15] | English: | Device for attaching a cable in a support plate | [2008/15] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'un câble dans une platine support | [2008/15] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 16.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.03.2010 | CY | 24.03.2010 | DK | 24.03.2010 | EE | 24.03.2010 | FI | 24.03.2010 | IE | 24.03.2010 | LT | 24.03.2010 | LV | 24.03.2010 | MT | 24.03.2010 | NL | 24.03.2010 | PL | 24.03.2010 | SE | 24.03.2010 | TR | 24.03.2010 | BG | 24.06.2010 | GR | 25.06.2010 | IS | 24.07.2010 | PT | 26.07.2010 | HU | 25.09.2010 | LU | 03.10.2010 | BE | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | FR | 02.11.2010 | [2013/14] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
CY | 24.03.2010 | ||
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
TR | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
IT | 03.10.2010 | ||
LU | 03.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
CY | 24.03.2010 | ||
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
IT | 03.10.2010 | ||
LU | 03.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
CY | 24.03.2010 | ||
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
IT | 03.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
CY | 24.03.2010 | ||
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
IT | 03.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
IT | 03.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
IT | 03.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5579662 (REASONER MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US6295889 (JONES STUART T [GB]) [A] 1,4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004046839 (KUESTER AUTOMOTIVE CONTROL SYS [DE]) |