EP1977832 - Medium agitation mill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASHIZAWA FINETECH LTD Akanehama 1-chome, 4-2 Narashino-shi CHIBA-KEN 275-8572 / JP | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishikawa, Tsuyoshi c/o ASHIZAWA FINETECH LTD Akanehama 1-chome 4-2 Narashino-shi Chiba-ken Chiba 275-8572 / JP | 02 /
Onuki, Jiro c/o ASHIZAWA FINETECH LTD Akanehama 1-chome 4-2 Narashino-shi Chiba-ken Chiba 275-8572 / JP | 03 /
Mitsuhashi, Yasuhiro c/o ASHIZAWA FINETECH LTD Akanehama 1-chome 4-2 Narashino-shi Chiba-ken Chiba 275-8572 / JP | 04 /
Harigai, Kaori c/o ASHIZAWA FINETECH LTD Akanehama 1-chome 4-2 Narashino-shi Chiba-ken Chiba 275-8572 / JP | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Jacobacci Coralis Harle 32, rue de l'Arcade 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/41] | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07301564.6 | 21.11.2007 | [2008/41] | Priority number, date | JP20070099964 | 06.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007099964 | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1977832 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1977832 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1977832 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B02C17/16, B02C17/18 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
B02C17/16 (EP,US);
B02C17/163 (KR);
B01F27/80 (KR);
B02C17/161 (EP,US);
B02C17/168 (KR);
B02C17/183 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/43] |
Former [2008/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rührwerksmühle | [2008/41] | English: | Medium agitation mill | [2008/41] | French: | Broyeur agitateur | [2008/41] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 29.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2007 | AT | 26.10.2016 | BE | 26.10.2016 | CY | 26.10.2016 | CZ | 26.10.2016 | DK | 26.10.2016 | EE | 26.10.2016 | ES | 26.10.2016 | FI | 26.10.2016 | IT | 26.10.2016 | LT | 26.10.2016 | LV | 26.10.2016 | MC | 26.10.2016 | NL | 26.10.2016 | PL | 26.10.2016 | RO | 26.10.2016 | SE | 26.10.2016 | SI | 26.10.2016 | SK | 26.10.2016 | TR | 26.10.2016 | IE | 21.11.2016 | MT | 21.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | FR | 26.12.2016 | BG | 26.01.2017 | GB | 26.01.2017 | GR | 27.01.2017 | IS | 26.02.2017 | PT | 27.02.2017 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.11.2007 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
TR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 26.12.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GB | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.11.2007 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 26.12.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GB | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 26.12.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GB | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 26.12.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1724023 (ASHIZAWA FINETECH LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5791569 (ISHIKAWA TSUYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0206207 (NETZSCH MASCHINENFABRIK [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 2 *; | [A]FR652217 (KRUPP FRIED GRUSONWERK AG) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2002306940 | WO9639251 | JP2006212488 | - Official Journal of the Particle Technology Society, (20040810), vol. 41, page 16 | - COLLECTION OF LECTURES GIVEN AT THE 40TH SUMMER SYMPOSIUM BY THE PARTICLE TECHNOLOGY SOCIETY, (20040729), page 13 |