EP1947823 - Method for collaboration between a mobile router and at least one other mobile router, said mobile routers having coordinated movement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states France Telecom 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klamm, Frédéric FRANCE TELECOM HAUTS DE SEINE 39 rue des petits Lutins 14530, LUC SUR MER / FR | 02 /
Binet, David FRANCE TELECOM HAUTS DE SEINE 20, avenue de la République 14550, BLAINVILLE SUR ORNE / FR | 03 /
Gaabab, Brahim FRANCE TELECOM HAUTS DE SEINE 14 bis chemin du Mirail (Apt 18) 31100, TOULOUSE / FR | [2012/16] |
Former [2008/30] | 01 /
Klamm, Frédéric HAUTS DE SEINE FRANCE TELECOM 39 rue des petits Lu 14530, LUC SUR MER / FR | ||
02 /
Binet, David HAUTS DE SEINE FRANCE TELECOM 20, avenue de le Rép 14550, BLAINVILLE SUR ORNE / FR | |||
03 /
Gaabab, Brahim HAUTS DE SEINE FRANCE TELECOM 14 bis chemin du Mir 31100, TOULOUSE / FR | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/16] | Application number, filing date | 07305002.3 | 21.12.2007 | [2008/30] | Priority number, date | FR20070052712 | 16.01.2007 Original published format: FR 0752712 | [2008/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1947823 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1947823 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W80/04 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
H04W80/04 (EP);
H04W84/005 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/30] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/30] | Title | German: | Kollaborationsverfahren zwischen einem mobilen Router und mindestens einem anderen mobilen Router, wobei diese mobilen Router beim Bewegen koordiniert sind | [2008/30] | English: | Method for collaboration between a mobile router and at least one other mobile router, said mobile routers having coordinated movement | [2008/30] | French: | Procédé de collaboration entre un routeur mobile et au moins un autre routeur mobile, lesdits routeurs mobiles etant coordonnes en deplacement | [2008/30] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 18.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2007 | AT | 18.04.2012 | CY | 18.04.2012 | CZ | 18.04.2012 | DK | 18.04.2012 | EE | 18.04.2012 | FI | 18.04.2012 | IT | 18.04.2012 | LT | 18.04.2012 | LV | 18.04.2012 | MT | 18.04.2012 | NL | 18.04.2012 | PL | 18.04.2012 | RO | 18.04.2012 | SE | 18.04.2012 | SI | 18.04.2012 | SK | 18.04.2012 | TR | 18.04.2012 | BG | 18.07.2012 | GR | 19.07.2012 | ES | 29.07.2012 | IS | 18.08.2012 | PT | 20.08.2012 | GB | 21.12.2012 | IE | 21.12.2012 | LU | 21.12.2012 | BE | 31.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
GB | 21.12.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
LU | 21.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
GB | 21.12.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
GB | 21.12.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 18.04.2012 | |
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 18.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1578067 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] - [0017] , [1837] *; | [X] - TSUKADA R KUNTZ T ERNST KEIO UNIVERSITY / WIDE M, "Analysis of Multiple Mobile Routers Cooperation", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20051017), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015043118 [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [2.2.1] , [02.2] , [02.3] , [03.3] , [0004] , [04.1] , [04.3] , [04.4] * | [X] - RYU N CHOI SEOUL NATIONAL UNIVERSITY E PAIK KT T KWON C PARK SEOUL NATIONAL UNIVERSITY J, "Failover for Multiple Mobile Routers in a Mobile Network", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20061022), no. 2, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015048483 [X] 1,2,6-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [6.2.1] * | [X] - TSUKADA, ERNST WAKIKAWA, MITSUYA, "Dynamic management of multiple mobile routers", IEEE PUBLICATION, (20051118), pages 1108 - 1113, XP002448726 [X] 1,6-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0004] * | [X] - EUN KYOUNG PAIK ET AL, "Load sharing and session preservation with multiple mobile routers for large scale network mobility", ADVANCED INFORMATION NETWORKING AND APPLICATIONS, 2004. AINA 2004. 18TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON FUKUOKA, JAPAN 29-31 MARCH 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040329), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7695-2051-0, pages 393 - 398, XP010695449 [X] 1,6-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [03.2] * | [A] - NG PANASONIC SINGAPORE LABS E PAIK KT T ERNST WIDE AT KEIO UNIVERSITY C, "Analysis of Multihoming in Network Mobility Support", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20041025), vol. nemo, no. 1, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015024112 [A] 1,6-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [02.5] , [03.1] , [0041] , [04.2] , [04.7] , [04.8] * | [A] - SEONGHO CHO JONGKEUN NA CHONGKWON KIM SEOUL NATIONAL UNIVERSITY SUNGJIN LEE HYUNJUNG KANG CHANGHOI KOO SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS, "Neighbor MR Authentication and Registration Mechanism in Multihomed Mobile Networks", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (200404), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015011762 [A] 1,6-11 * page 1 * * paragraphs [0004] , [04.1] , [04.2] , [05.1] , [05.3] , [06.1] * | by applicant | - DE V.P. KAFLE ET AL., IECE TRANS. COMMUN., (200610), vol. E89-B, no. 10 |