EP2072885 - Natural gas supply method and apparatus. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryostar SAS Zone Industrielle Boite Postale 48 68220 Hesingue / FR | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuchs, Vincent 12 rue de Huningue 68870 Bartenheim / FR | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | Morelle, Guy Georges Alain Cabinet Morelle & Bardou S.C. 9 Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 31522 Ramonville Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Morelle, Guy Georges Alain Cabinet Morelle & Bardou S.C. 9 Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 31522 Ramonville Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07352008.2 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2072885 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F17C9/04, F17C9/02, F17C13/02 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
F17C9/04 (EP,US);
F17C13/021 (EP,US);
F17C9/02 (EP,US);
F17C2221/033 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0161 (EP,US);
F17C2223/033 (EP,US);
F17C2223/043 (EP,US);
F17C2223/047 (EP,US);
F17C2225/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2225/035 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0135 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0142 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0178 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0185 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0309 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0393 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0408 (EP,US);
F17C2250/061 (EP,US);
F17C2260/035 (EP,US);
F17C2265/022 (EP,US);
F17C2265/066 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0105 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/09] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Naturgasversorgungsverfahren und -vorrichtung | [2009/26] | English: | Natural gas supply method and apparatus. | [2009/26] | French: | Procédé et appareil d'alimentation en gaz naturel | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/24] | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005058692 (WAERTSILAE FINLAND OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005058684 (WAERTSILAE FINLAND OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2876981 (GAZ TRANSP ET TECHNIGAZ SOC PA [FR]) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US6089022 (ZEDNIK JAY J [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1291576 (CRYOSTAR FRANCE SA [FR]); | [A]FR2851301 (ALSTOM [FR]); | [A]FR2160055 (HOWALDTSWERKE DEUTSCHE WERFT); | [A]EP1672269 (ALSTOM [FR]); | [A]US2007125122 (MAK JOHN [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1291576 | WO2006077094 | WO2005068847 | EP1132698 |