EP1859969 - Elastic belt with studs for snow and black ice for an automobile tyre with quick and easy assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bonpain, Bernard 8, Rue de la Traversiere 59551 Attiches / FR | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/48] | Application number, filing date | 07370011.4 | 22.05.2007 | [2007/48] | Priority number, date | FR20060004607 | 23.05.2006 Original published format: FR 0604607 | [2007/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1859969 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60C27/16, B60C27/12 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
B60C27/12 (EP);
B60C27/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] |
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, LI | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elastischer Schnee- und Glatteisschutz mit Stollen für Autoreifen zur einfachen und schnellen Montage | [2007/48] | English: | Elastic belt with studs for snow and black ice for an automobile tyre with quick and easy assembly | [2007/48] | French: | Ceinture élastique anti-neige et verglas à crampons pour pneumatique d'automobile à montage facile et rapide | [2007/48] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 20.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/34] | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19959381 (RAMSAUER HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US1568581 (ALBERT JOSEPH A) [A] 1 * page 1; figure - *; | [A]FR357750 (BRISSON, H.-J.-A.) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US1830556 (RANDOLPH NELSON CARL) [A] 1 * page 1; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]GB191210015 (WATKEYS FREDERICK HARRY) [A] 1 * page 2; figure 1 * |