EP1911914 - Lock bar designed for opening and closing a door such as the door of a truck, trailer or others [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thiriet ZAE rue François Urano (ex Chemin de Sury) 08000 Warcq / FR | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thiriet, Philippe c/o Thiriet ZAE rue François Urano (ex. Chemin de Sury) 0800 Warcq / FR | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Duthoit, Michel Georges André Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 96/98, Boulevard Carnot B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Duthoit, Michel Georges André Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés, 96/98, Boulevard Carnot, B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07370018.9 | 28.09.2007 | [2008/16] | Priority number, date | FR20060008699 | 04.10.2006 Original published format: FR 0608699 | FR20070002436 | 03.04.2007 Original published format: FR 0702436 | [2008/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1911914 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1911914 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/16 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
E05B83/10 (EP);
E05B63/0069 (EP);
E05B79/20 (EP);
E05B13/10 (EP);
E05B47/00 (EP);
E05B53/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Title | German: | Griff zum Öffnen und Schliessen von Öffnungsflügeln, wie etwa LKW-Türen, Anhängertüren etc. | [2008/16] | English: | Lock bar designed for opening and closing a door such as the door of a truck, trailer or others | [2008/16] | French: | Crémone, destinée à la manoeuvre d'ouverture et de fermeture d'un ouvrant, tel que porte de camion, remorque ou autres | [2008/16] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 12.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.05.2009 | CY | 13.05.2009 | CZ | 13.05.2009 | DK | 13.05.2009 | EE | 13.05.2009 | FI | 13.05.2009 | IE | 13.05.2009 | LT | 13.05.2009 | LV | 13.05.2009 | MT | 13.05.2009 | RO | 13.05.2009 | SI | 13.05.2009 | SK | 13.05.2009 | TR | 13.05.2009 | BG | 13.08.2009 | SE | 13.08.2009 | GR | 14.08.2009 | IS | 13.09.2009 | PT | 13.09.2009 | LU | 28.09.2009 | BE | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | HU | 14.11.2009 | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/44] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
CY | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
MT | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
TR | 13.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
LU | 28.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
HU | 14.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
MT | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
LU | 28.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
HU | 14.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
MT | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
LU | 28.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2162573 (TAKIGEN MFG CO) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH0335172U (-) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * * figures 4,5 *; | [A]EP0539300 (THIRIET PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * * column 7, line 26 - column 8, line 47 *; | [A]EP0580911 (UNIJECT S A [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2779167 (POMMIER & CIE [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP1564354 (THIRIET S A S [FR]) [DA] 1* the whole document * |