EP1911353 - Processing method; in particular blanching and/or cooking of food products in bulk [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bonduelle Société à Actions Simplifiée La Woestyne Renescure 59173 Renescure / FR | [2011/48] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Bonduelle Société Anonyme La Woestyne 59173 Renescure / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maureaux, Alain c/o Bonduelle La Woestyne 59173 Renescure / FR | 02 /
Luchini, François c/o Bonduelle La Woestyne 59173 Renescure / FR | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Boubal, Denis Henri Jacques, et al Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 31, rue des Poissonceaux CS 40009 59044 Lille Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Boubal, Denis Henri Jacques, et al Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 96/98, Boulevard Carnot B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2011/16] | Duthoit, Michel Georges André Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 96/98, Boulevard Carnot B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/16] | Duthoit, Michel Georges André Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés Conseil en Propiété Industrielle 96/98, Boulevard Carnot, B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07370022.1 | 12.10.2007 | [2008/16] | Priority number, date | FR20060008946 | 12.10.2006 Original published format: FR 0608946 | [2008/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1911353 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1911353 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A23B7/06, A23N12/04 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
A23B7/06 (EP);
A23L3/185 (EP);
A23L5/13 (EP);
A23N12/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Title | German: | Behandlungsverfahren; insbesondere zum Blanchieren und/oder Kochen von losen Lebensmitteln | [2011/12] | English: | Processing method; in particular blanching and/or cooking of food products in bulk | [2008/16] | French: | Procédé de traitement; notamment de blanchiment et/ou de cuisson de produits alimentaires en vrac | [2008/16] |
Former [2008/16] | Behandlungsverfahren, insbesondere zum Blanchieren und/oder Kochen von losen Lebensmitteln | Examination procedure | 09.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.07.2011 | CY | 27.07.2011 | CZ | 27.07.2011 | EE | 27.07.2011 | FI | 27.07.2011 | IE | 27.07.2011 | LT | 27.07.2011 | LV | 27.07.2011 | MT | 27.07.2011 | RO | 27.07.2011 | SE | 27.07.2011 | SI | 27.07.2011 | SK | 27.07.2011 | LU | 12.10.2011 | BG | 27.10.2011 | GR | 28.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | IS | 27.11.2011 | [2013/29] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
LU | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 27.07.2011 | |
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 27.07.2011 | |
IS | 27.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0073095 (CANADIAN PATENTS DEV [CA]) [A] 1,9,14 * page 2, line 30 - line 36 ** page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 11 *; | [X]US4702161 (ANDERSEN NIELS J [DK]) [X] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A]EP0498972 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,5,9 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 31; example -; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0601952 (BONDUELLE SA ETS [FR]) [X] 1,5,9,14,15 * abstract *; | [A]EP0760214 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A]US6263785 (ZITTEL DAVID R [US]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | by applicant | US4702161 | EP0601952 |