EP1978078 - Preserved olive paste [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mediterranea Identitat S.L. Av. Diputación N[deg] 64 Bajos 43850 Cambrils, Tarragona / ES | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Márque Gómez, Amador Av. Diputación N[deg] 64. Bajos 43850 Cambrils Tarragona / ES | 02 /
Costa Escoda, Telm Av. Diputación N[deg] 64. Bajos 43850 Cambrils Tarragona / ES | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Pons Ariño, Angel Pons Patentes y Marcas Internacional, S.L. Glorieta Rubén Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Pons Arino, Angel Pons Patentes y Marcas Internacional, S.L. Glorieta Ruben Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 07380090.6 | 04.04.2007 | [2008/41] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1978078 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C11B1/02, C11B1/06 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
C11B1/06 (EP,US);
A23B7/04 (EP,US);
A23D7/06 (EP,US);
A23D9/06 (EP,US);
C11B1/02 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/2131 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Konservierte Olivenpaste | [2008/41] | English: | Preserved olive paste | [2008/41] | French: | Pâte d'olive conservée | [2008/41] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2007 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 08.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6309652 (AESCHBACH ROBERT [CH], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 27 - line 29; claim 1 * * column 1, line 44 - line 60 *; | [X] - MIGLIORINI M; MUGELLI M; CHERUBINI C; VITI P; ZANONI B, "Influence of O2 on the quality of virgin olive oil during malaxation", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, (200610), vol. 86, no. 13, pages 2140 - 2146, XP002449073 [X] 1-6 * page 2142, column L, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figure 1 * * page 2144, column L, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jsfa.2588 | [A] - GIOVACCHINO DI L ET AL, "INFLUENCE OF OLIVE PROCESSING ON VIRGIN OLIVE OIL QUALITY", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF LIPID SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, WILEY VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, (200209), vol. 104, no. 9/10, ISSN 1438-7697, pages 587 - 601, XP001130399 [A] 4,5 * page 593, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1438-9312(200210)104:9/10<587::AID-EJLT587>3.0.CO;2-M | [A] - MAHJOUB A; BULLERMAN L B, "Effects of Nutrients and Inhibitors in Olives on Aflatoxigenic Molds", JOURNAL OF FOOD PROTECTION, US, (1987), vol. 50, no. 11, pages 959 - 963, XP008083027 [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - MONTEDORO G ET AL, "RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN PHENOLIC COMPOSITION OF OLIVE FRUIT AND OLIVE OIL: THEIMPORTANCE OF THE ENDOGENOUS ENZYMES", ACTA HORTICULTURAE, INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR HORTICULTURAL SCIENCE,, NL, (2002), vol. 586, ISSN 0567-7572, pages 551 - 556, XP008082756 [A] 1-6 * page 552, paragraph 2 * |