EP1942059 - Packaging box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unex Aparellaje Electrico S.L. Rafael Campalans 15-21 08903 L'Hospitalet de Llobregat (Barcelona) / ES | [2008/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naveros Martín, Juan José Sant Andreu de la Barca 4 08760-Martorell (Barcelona) / ES | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Curell Aguilà, Marcelino, et al CURELL SUÑOL S.L.P. Passeig de Gràcia 65 bis 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Curell Aguilà, Marcelino, et al Curell Suñol European Patent Attorneys Passeig de Gràcia, 65 bis 08008 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2008/28] | Curell Aguilà, Marcelino, et al Dr. Ing. M. Curell Sunol I.I. S.L. Passeig de Gràcia, 65 bis 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 07380367.8 | 19.12.2007 | [2008/28] | Priority number, date | ES20070000010U | 03.01.2007 Original published format: ES 200700010 U | [2008/28] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1942059 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1942059 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/54, B65D5/66 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
B65D5/5405 (EP);
B65D5/6608 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, PT [2009/12] |
Former [2008/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verpackungsschachtel | [2008/28] | English: | Packaging box | [2008/28] | French: | Boîte d'emballage | [2008/28] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 10.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2012/03] | IT | 19.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3357630 (ERWIN MICHELITSCH) [Y] 1-7 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 5; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE29919435U (SCHORSY BERNHARD [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * page 9, line 7 - line 21; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2004112948 (BONE LARRY [US]) [Y] 3-5 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2983420 (RELLSTAB GEORGE C) [Y] 7 * column 3, line 5 - line 6; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0058640 (ISLER ERNST) [A] 1-7 * figures 1,2; claim 5 * | by applicant | US3357630 | EP0058640 |