EP1939128 - Transport system for the movement of passengers/goods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Norte, S.A. Poligono Industrial La Pereda, s/n 33682 Mieres-Asturias / ES | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Elevator (ES/PBB) Ltd. Burgan House Reception C, First Floor The Causeway Staines London TW18 3PA / GB | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gonzalez Alemany, Miguel Angel Camino de La reguera, 11 33682 Mieres (Asturias) / ES | 02 /
Gonzalez Pantiga, Juan Domingo Urbanizacion Playa dek Arbeyal, 6-3[deg]A 33212 Gijon (Asturias) / ES | 03 /
Alonso Cuello, Manuel Camino del Lucero, 7,3[deg]H 33212 Gijon (Asturias) / ES | 04 /
Muniz Camblor, Abdon Fernando Vela n[deg] 18 33011 Oviedo (Asturias) / ES | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co., C/ Goya No. 11 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 07380373.6 | 20.12.2007 | [2008/27] | Priority number, date | ES20060003324 | 29.12.2006 Original published format: ES 200603324 | [2008/27] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1939128 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1939128 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B66B21/12, B66B23/02 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
B66B21/12 (EP,ES,US);
B66B23/02 (EP,US);
B66B23/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Title | German: | Fördersystem zum Transport von Passagieren oder Waren | [2008/27] | English: | Transport system for the movement of passengers/goods | [2008/27] | French: | Système de transport pour le déplacement de passagers/marchandises | [2008/27] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 29.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/01] | 18.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1185913 (CUMBERBIRCH ALAN); | [A]US3672484 (ANGIOLETTI ATTILIO E, et al); | [A]GB1383785 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS); | [A]JPH03152087 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [X]EP0646538 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [X]GB2328193 (PATTISION MICHAEL [GB]); | [X]US6138816 (SATO TOMOAKI [JP], et al); | [A]EP1253101 (THYSSEN NORTE S A [ES]) | by applicant | GB1185913 | ES2179720 |