EP1816731 - A REVERSIBLE HIGH-PERFORMANCE ELECTRIC MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/32] | A reversible high-performance electric machine | ||
[2009/18] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soluciones Energeticas, S.A. Avda. Real de Pinto, 146 28021 Madrid / ES | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vela Vigo, Antonio Avda. Real de Pinto, 146 28001 Madrid / ES | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Urizar Anasagasti, Jesus Maria IPAMARK, S.L. C/ Segre 27- 1° 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | Urizar Anasagasti, Jesus Maria IPAMARK, S.L., Paseo de la Castellana, 72-1 28046 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 07381008.7 | 02.02.2007 | [2007/32] | Priority number, date | ES20060000233 | 02.02.2006 Original published format: ES 200600233 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1816731 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Classification | IPC: | H02K21/14, H02K29/03 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
H02K29/03 (EP);
H02K19/103 (ES);
H02K21/14 (ES);
Y02B10/30 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Reversibel Hochleistungselektromaschine | [2007/32] | English: | A REVERSIBLE HIGH-PERFORMANCE ELECTRIC MACHINE | [2009/18] | French: | Machine électrique réversible à haute performance | [2007/32] |
Former [2007/32] | A reversible high-performance electric machine | Examination procedure | 03.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/08] | 09.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |