EP1857027 - Automatic instant "frappé" coffee machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Petroudis, Thomas Linden Strasse 2 74653 Kunzelsau / DE | [2007/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Bakatselou, Vassiliki 4, Danaidon Street 546 26 Thessaloniki / GR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Bakatselou, Vassiliki 4, Danaidon Street GR-546 26 Thessaloniki / GR | Application number, filing date | 07386012.4 | 11.05.2007 | [2007/47] | Priority number, date | GR20060100292 | 15.05.2006 Original published format: GR 20060100292 | [2007/47] | Filing language | EL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1857027 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/40, B67D1/00 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
A47J31/401 (EP,GR);
G07F13/065 (GR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Title | German: | Automatische Instant-Frappé-Kaffeemaschine | [2007/47] | English: | Automatic instant "frappé" coffee machine | [2007/47] | French: | Machine pour la préparation automatique de café frappé instantané | [2007/47] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/23] | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1589500 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US2006034987 (THAKUR BELI R [US] ET AL THAKUR BELI R [US] ET AL) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] *; | [X]GB1367354 (GKN SANKEY LTD) [X] 1-13 * figure 2 * * page 2, lines 17-30 *; | [PX]EP1690481 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4319698 (TOMIYAMA MUNEO ET AL) [Y] 1 * figure 1 * * page 2, lines 49-59 * * page 6, lines 13-26 *; | [Y]US4903585 (WIMMERS JAMES E [US] ET AL) [Y] 1 * column 1, lines 36-64 * |