EP1878823 - Method and device for representing sewing processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BERNINA International AG Seestrasse 161 8266 Steckborn / CH | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zickenberg, Boris Auf dem Oesch 14 78267 Aach / DE | 02 /
Zeiger, Stefan Möhrlistrasse 28 8006 Zürich / CH | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Gachnang AG Patentanwälte Badstrasse 5 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/10] | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Gachnang AG Patentanwälte Badstrasse 5 Postfach 8501 Frauenfeld 1 / CH | ||
Former [2008/03] | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Gachnang AG Badstrasse 5 Postfach 323 8501 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 07405112.9 | 11.04.2007 | [2008/03] | Priority number, date | CH20060001099 | 10.07.2006 Original published format: CH 10992006 | [2008/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1878823 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1878823 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D05B19/00, D05B19/10 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
D05B19/105 (EP,US);
D05B19/006 (EP,US);
D05D2205/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, SE [2019/10] |
Former [2008/39] | CH, DE, LI, SE | ||
Former [2008/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Darstellen von Nahprozessen | [2008/03] | English: | Method and device for representing sewing processes | [2008/03] | French: | Procédé et dispositif destinés à la représentation de processus de couture | [2008/03] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 17.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 04.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 06.03.2019 | [2019/34] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09105069 (BROTHER IND LTD) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A]JPH09188954 (BARUDAN CO LTD) [A] 1,9,10 * abstract *; | [DA]US5983817 (SEKINE KIYOKAZU [JP]); | [A]US2001027738 (HARTWIG JURGEN [DE]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005234584 (MIZUNO MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,9 * figure - *; | [A]US2006027154 (NAKA TAKAFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1,9 * figure - *; | [A]EP1676945 (SHIMA SEIKI MFG [JP]) [A] 9 * the whole document * | Examination | WO02054370 |