EP1926034 - Method and assignment of objects to persons and system for performing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InfoMedis AG Brüningstrasse 25 6055 Alpnach / CH | [2008/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mezger, Tobias Römerstrasse 28 8214 Gächlingen / CH | 02 /
Kern, Christian Girhaldenweg 7a 8048 Zürich / CH | 03 /
Zemp, Rolf Sonnmattstrasse 2a 6055 Alpnach / CH | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Nückel, Thomas Patentanwaltskanzlei Nückel, Oberhostattstrasse 18 6375 Beckenried, NW / CH | [2008/22] | Application number, filing date | 07405159.0 | 04.06.2007 | [2008/22] | Priority number, date | CH20060001905 | 27.11.2006 Original published format: CH 19052006 | [2008/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1926034 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
G16H40/20 (EP);
G16H10/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/06] |
Former [2008/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Zuordnung von Objekten zu Personen sowie System zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [2008/22] | English: | Method and assignment of objects to persons and system for performing the method | [2008/22] | French: | Procédé et agencement d'objets par rapport à des personnes tout comme système de réalisation du procédé | [2008/22] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/23] | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - Die in der Anmeldung (Art 92 EPÜ) definierten technischen Aspekte werden als allgemein bekannt angesehen. Wegen ihrer Bekanntheit wird kein schriftlicher Nachweis für notwendig erachtet. Weitere Einzelheiten finden sich in der beiliegenden Stellungnahme und in der unterhalb angegebenen Referenz., XP002456252 [L] 1-16 |