EP2009453 - Rogowski current sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIAISONS ELECTRONIQUES-MECANIQUES LEM S.A. 8, chemin des Aulx 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Turpin, Pierre 15 rue de la Pierre d'Angeroux 74800 La Roche sur Foron / FR | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Reuteler, Raymond Werner Reuteler & Cie SA Chemin de la Vuarpillière 29 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | Reuteler, Raymond Werner Reuteler & Cie SA Chemin de la Vuarpillière 29 1260 Nyon / CH | Application number, filing date | 07405183.0 | 28.06.2007 | [2009/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2009453 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | FR | [2009/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2009453 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/18 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
G01R15/181 (EP,US);
Y02P20/141 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Title | German: | Rogowski-Stromsensor | [2011/02] | English: | Rogowski current sensor | [2009/01] | French: | Capteur de courant Rogowski | [2009/01] |
Former [2009/01] | Rogowskistromsensor | Examination procedure | 08.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 13.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.2011 | CY | 27.04.2011 | CZ | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | EE | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | HU | 27.04.2011 | IE | 27.04.2011 | LT | 27.04.2011 | LV | 27.04.2011 | MT | 27.04.2011 | NL | 27.04.2011 | PL | 27.04.2011 | RO | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | SI | 27.04.2011 | SK | 27.04.2011 | TR | 27.04.2011 | LU | 28.06.2011 | BE | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | BG | 27.07.2011 | GB | 27.07.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | ES | 07.08.2011 | IS | 27.08.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
TR | 27.04.2011 | ||
LU | 28.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GB | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
LU | 28.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GB | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
LU | 28.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
GB | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
GB | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
GB | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
PT | 29.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3434052 (FECHANT LOUIS JOSEPH) [A] 1-14 * column 3, lines 26-32; figure 3 * * column 4, lines 46-54 *; | [A]JPH0831665 (TAIYO YUDEN KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]DE29706641U (PFISTERER ELEKTROTECH KARL [DE]) [A] 1-14* figures 1A-5; claims 1,13 *; | [YA]WO9954740 (POWER ELECTRONIC MEASUREMENTS [GB], et al) [Y] 1-3,6,9-13 * page 10, line 26 - page 11, line 21; figures 3,4 * [A] ; | [YA]US6313623 (KOJOVIC LJUBOMIR A [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,6,9-13 * column 5, lines 25-30 * * column 9, lines 28-60 * [A] 4,5,7,8,14 | by applicant | WO9954740 | US6313623 |