EP2030924 - Device for processing printed products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Müller Martini Holding AG Sonnenbergstrasse 13 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zancanaro, Giorgio Weingartenweg 2 4702 Oensingen / CH | [2009/10] | Application number, filing date | 07405253.1 | 28.08.2007 | [2009/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2030924 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65H7/08, B65H7/10, B65H7/14 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
B65H7/14 (EP,US);
B65H7/08 (EP,US);
B65H7/10 (EP,US);
B65H2511/11 (EP,US);
B65H2511/12 (EP,US);
B65H2511/13 (EP,US);
B65H2511/20 (EP,US);
B65H2511/216 (EP,US);
B65H2511/24 (EP,US);
B65H2511/514 (EP,US);
B65H2553/414 (EP,US);
B65H2553/416 (EP,US);
B65H2553/42 (EP,US);
B65H2553/45 (EP,US);
B65H2553/81 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/11, B65H2220/03 (EP,US);
B65H2511/12, B65H2220/03 (US,EP);
B65H2511/20, B65H2220/02 (US,EP);
B65H2511/24, B65H2220/03 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Verarbeiten von Druckprodukten | [2009/10] | English: | Device for processing printed products | [2009/10] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de produits imprimés | [2009/10] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/32] | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS62230543 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-3,10 * abstract *; | [X]JPH05294513 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1,2,6,10 * abstract *; | [X]JPH06191684 (NEC CORP) [X] 1,2,4-8 * abstract *; | [A]US5447240 (MAKINO TOMONORI [JP]) [A] * abstract ** column 4, line 36 - line 51 *; | [X]DE19941728 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 1, line 3 - line 5 * * column 3, line 17 - line 60; figure - *; | [A]DE10034072 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] * column 5, line 40 - line 67; figure 8 *; | [X]EP1223132 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,10 * paragraphs [0006] , [0016] - [0020] - [0024] , [0042]; figure - *; | [X]EP1249415 (NEXPRESS SOLUTIONS LLC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,10-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] , [0009] , [0011] , [0012]; figure 3; claims 1,2 *; | [X]DE20216042U (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,9,15 * page 7, line 9 - page 10, line 16; claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP1279634 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,14 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] *; | [X]EP1300354 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0010]; claim 1 *; | [X]US2003072499 (SAWADA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,10-13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0007] , [25.32] , [0042] , [0043] , [0053] - [0055]; figures 7,10 * |