EP2062542 - Device for re-closing a pressurised compressible elastic container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INOVA MEDICAL AG Alte Steinhauserstrasse 1 6330 Cham / CH | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harren, Ernst Diethelm Grabenackerstrasse 32 6312 Steinhausen / CH | 02 /
Stanek, Jan Kozeluzska 1057 53705 Chrudim / CZ | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Giesshübelstrasse 62 8045 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 Postfach 473 8034 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2009/22] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 07405331.5 | 23.11.2007 | [2009/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2062542 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, // A61B17/08, A61F13/00 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
A61B17/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Wiederverschliessen eines druckbeaufschlagten komprimierbaren elastischen Gefässes | [2009/22] | English: | Device for re-closing a pressurised compressible elastic container | [2009/22] | French: | Dispositif destiné à refermer un récipient élastique alimenté par pression pouvant être comprimé | [2009/22] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 15.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 03.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19726386 (HARREN ERNST DIETHELM [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,11,14 * column 3, line 20 - column 5, line 66; figures 2,4,5 * * column 7, line 1 - line 31 * * column 7, line 45 - column 8, line 39 * * column 10, line 59 - column 11, line 34 * [Y] 6,9,12,13; | [YA]DE102006055572 (SERUMWERK BERNBURG AG [DE]) [Y] 9,12,13 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1-20 * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0084] * [A] 1,2,8,10,11,14; | [A]WO2006042431 (INOVA MEDICAL AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 28 - page 5, line 30; figures 1-3 * * page 6, line 27 - page 8, line 31 *; | [YA]EP1285745 (DAICEL DEGUSSA LTD [JP]) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0129] * [A] 3,4,7; | [Y]GB2205243 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON) [Y] 6 * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 10 * * page 2, line 25 - page 6, line 31; figures 1-6 * * page 12, line 22 - line 25 *; | [YA]EP0722990 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 6 * page 2, line 36 - page 4, line 8; figures 1,6 * * page 8, line 4 - line 45 * * page 14, line 9 - page 17, line 40 * [A] 3,4,7; | [YA]EP0915142 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009]; figure 1 * [A] 3,4,7 | by applicant | EP0776179 | WO9605774 | EP0955901 | WO9822027 | WO2006042431 |