EP1953063 - Field vital output device and system for directly interfacing a control logic unit with at least one or more wayside units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM FERROVIARIA S.P.A. Via O. Moreno, 23 12038 Savigliano (Cuneo) / IT | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campedelli, Francesco Via Orsoni 19 40068 S. Lazzaro di Savena (BO) / IT | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Karaghiosoff, Giorgio Alessandro c/o Praxi Intellectual Property S.p.A. - Savona Via F. Baracca 1R, 4° piano "Il Gabbiano" 17100 Savona / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Karaghiosoff, Giorgio Alessandro Studio Karaghiosoff e Frizzi s.r.l. Via Pecorile 25 17015 Celle Ligure (SV) / IT | Application number, filing date | 07425064.8 | 05.02.2007 | [2008/32] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1953063 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1953063 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B61L7/08 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
B61L7/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Title | German: | Ausgabegerät und System zur Verbindung einer Steuerungslogik-Einheit mit einer oder mehreren streckenseitigen Einheiten | [2008/32] | English: | Field vital output device and system for directly interfacing a control logic unit with at least one or more wayside units | [2008/32] | French: | Dispositif de terrain de sortie vitale et système pour une interface directe entre une unité logique de commande et au moins une ou plusieurs unités en bordure de voie | [2008/32] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 04.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.12.2008 | BE | 31.12.2008 | CY | 31.12.2008 | CZ | 31.12.2008 | DK | 31.12.2008 | EE | 31.12.2008 | FI | 31.12.2008 | LT | 31.12.2008 | LV | 31.12.2008 | NL | 31.12.2008 | PL | 31.12.2008 | RO | 31.12.2008 | SI | 31.12.2008 | SK | 31.12.2008 | TR | 31.12.2008 | IE | 05.02.2009 | LU | 05.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | FR | 02.03.2009 | BG | 31.03.2009 | SE | 31.03.2009 | IS | 30.04.2009 | PT | 01.06.2009 | HU | 01.07.2009 | DE | 01.09.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 05.02.2009 | ||
LU | 05.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
HU | 01.07.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 05.02.2009 | ||
LU | 05.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 05.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 05.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 31.12.2008 | |
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
PL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5922034 (FEELY BENNETT R [US]) [A] 1,29,36 * column 4, line 35 - column 6, line 60 ** figures 2-5 *; | [A]DE19836079 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,29,36 * column 1, line 3 - column 1, line 14 * * column 2, line 44 - column 2, line 58 * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 46 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US6463337 (WALKER JIM E [US]) [A] 1-39 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 9 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1524167 (SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [A] 1,29,36 * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0015] - [0019] * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP1594101 (SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [A] 1,29,36 * paragraphs [0011] , [0023] * * figure 1.2 * |