EP1967669 - Formwork member, formwork, pouring and curing plant and related method for making building elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cuttitta, Carlo Via Varazze, 7 00048 Nettuno RM / IT | For all designated states Soave, Leonardo Via Como, 18 00161 Roma RM / IT | [2008/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | Leone, Mario, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Via XX Settembre, 98g 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Leone, Mario, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Viale della Tecnica, 205 00144 Roma / IT | ||
Former [2008/37] | Leone, Mario, et al Studio Associato LEONE & SPADARO Viale Europa, 15 00144 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 07425138.0 | 09.03.2007 | [2008/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1967669 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1967669 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E04G9/10 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
E04G9/10 (EP);
E04G17/0652 (EP);
E04G17/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] | Title | German: | Schalelement, Schalung, Anlage zum Giessen und Behandeln von Bauelementen, sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2008/37] | English: | Formwork member, formwork, pouring and curing plant and related method for making building elements | [2008/37] | French: | Elément de coffrage, coffrage, installation de coulage et de traitement d'éléments de bâtiments, et procédé de fabrication de tels éléments | [2008/37] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 01.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/02] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.01.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.02.2011 | BE | 02.02.2011 | CY | 02.02.2011 | CZ | 02.02.2011 | DK | 02.02.2011 | EE | 02.02.2011 | FI | 02.02.2011 | HU | 02.02.2011 | IT | 02.02.2011 | LT | 02.02.2011 | LV | 02.02.2011 | MT | 02.02.2011 | NL | 02.02.2011 | PL | 02.02.2011 | RO | 02.02.2011 | SE | 02.02.2011 | SI | 02.02.2011 | SK | 02.02.2011 | TR | 02.02.2011 | IE | 09.03.2011 | LU | 09.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | FR | 04.04.2011 | BG | 02.05.2011 | GB | 02.05.2011 | GR | 03.05.2011 | ES | 13.05.2011 | IS | 02.06.2011 | PT | 02.06.2011 | DE | 01.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
IT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
MT | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
TR | 02.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LU | 09.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 04.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GB | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
DE | 01.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
IT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
MT | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LU | 09.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 04.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GB | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
DE | 01.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
IT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
MT | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 04.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GB | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
DE | 01.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
IT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
MT | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 04.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
DE | 01.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
MT | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 04.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
DE | 01.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
MT | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 04.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
MT | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 02.02.2011 | |
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 02.02.2011 | |
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2602210 (WILLIAM RUMBLE ROY) [X] 1,2,6 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 53; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB1063738 (RHODIUS DELVILLE SA) [X] 1,2 * page 2, lines 14-43; figures 3,4 *; | [XY]DE1917398 (VERSTEEG GIJSBERT) [X] 1,2,6,7,10,11 * page 5, paragraph 8 - page 8, paragraph 1; claims 1,4 * * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 2; figures 1-5 * [Y] 14,15; | [X]DE2309104 (MATTHEY DE L ETANG WILLIAM H) [X] 1,11,16 * page 7, paragraph 7 - page 8, paragraph 3; figures 1,3; claim 10 *; | [X]EP0232109 (ONTARIO INC 589576 [CA]) [X] 1,11 * column 6, line 41 - column 7, line 31; figures 1-3 * * abstract *; | [X]US5595171 (MAKIN COLIN [CA]) [X] 1,6 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 30; figures 1-4 * * abstract *; | [Y]WO9735071 (BRUCKELMYER MARK [US]) [Y] 12-15 * page 7, line 22 - page 9, line 27; figures 1,5 ** abstract *; | [XY]DE102004045052 (WEBER ROLAND [DE]) [X] 1 * page 2, paragraph 8 - page 3, paragraph 14 * * abstract * [Y] 12-15 | by applicant | US2602210 | GB1063738 | DE1917398 | DE2309104 | EP0232109 | US5595171 |