EP1995811 - Method for purging pem-type fuel cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electro Power Systems S.p.A. Via Livorno 60 10144 Torino (TO) / IT | [2010/25] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states Electro Power Systems S.p.A. Via Grange Palmero, 104 10091 Alpignano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cherchi, Pierpaolo Corso Lione, 40 10141 Torino / IT | 02 /
Borello, Luisa Corso Francia, 222/a 10093 Collegno / IT | 03 /
Musso, Andrea Via Sabaudia, 42 10095 Grugliasco / IT | 04 /
Gianolio, Giuseppe Via Aldo Moro, 30 14010 Cellarengo / IT | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 07425326.1 | 25.05.2007 | [2008/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1995811 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M16/00 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
H01M8/0438 (EP,US);
H01M16/003 (EP,US);
H01M8/04179 (EP,US);
H01M8/04231 (EP,US);
H01M8/04388 (EP,US);
H01M8/04761 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von PEM-Brennstoffzellen | [2008/48] | English: | Method for purging pem-type fuel cells | [2008/48] | French: | Procédé de collecte de cellules de carburant de type pem | [2008/48] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 22.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 10.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 26.04.2010 | [2010/30] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1331679 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 9-17 * paragraphs [0018] , [0020] - [0023] - [0031] , [0032] * [Y] 1-8; | [Y]EP1672727 (BALLARD POWER SYSTEMS [CA]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0011] , [0016] * |