EP1997626 - Image forming apparatus with interchangeable drum, in particular for printing litographic plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andromeda S.r.l. Viale della Libertà, 153/A 81020 S. Marco Evangelista (CE) / IT | [2008/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pignatiello, Felice Via S. Martino, 41 80048 S. Anastasia (NA) / IT | 02 /
Spano, Paolo Via E. Garbin, 29 00139 Roma / IT | 03 /
De Giacomo, Luigi Corso Italia, 175 82026 Morcone (BN) / IT | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Leone, Mario, et al Studio Associato Leone & Spadaro Viale Europa, 15 00144 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | Leone, Mario, et al Studio Associato Leone & Spadaro Viale Europa, 15 00144 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 07425336.0 | 01.06.2007 | [2008/49] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1997626 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/10, G03F7/20 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
G03F7/24 (EP);
B41C1/1075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/33] |
Former [2008/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bebilderungseinrichtung mit austauschbarem Trommel, insbesondere zum Bedrucken von lithographischen Druckplatten | [2008/49] | English: | Image forming apparatus with interchangeable drum, in particular for printing litographic plates | [2008/49] | French: | Dispositif de production d'image avec un cylindre interchangeable, en particulier pour l'impression de plaques lithographiques | [2008/49] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/48] | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003127004 (KITAWAKI SHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0048] , [0068] , [0071] , [0075]; figures 1,10 *; | [X]US2003188654 (SHIH RICHARD T [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraph [0044]; figure 6 *; | [X]GB2410720 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * pages 9-15 *; | [X]EP1227654 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraphs [0032] - [0045] *; | [A]EP0828196 (PRESSTEK INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4-6 * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 26 * * column 6, lines 54-57 * |