EP2014499 - Hybrid vehicle power transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magneti Marelli S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti 61/63 Corbetta (MI) / IT | [2010/24] |
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states MAGNETI MARELLI POWERTRAIN S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti, 61/63 20011 Corbetta (MI) / IT | ||
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Magneti Marelli Powertrain S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti, 61/63 28011 Corbetta / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Medico, Giuseppe Via Adige, 2/A 10098 Rivoli / IT | 02 /
Palazzetti, Andrea Via Oscar Borgesa, 66/B 10051 Avigliana / IT | 03 /
Amisano, Fabrizio Via Fagnano, 10 10144 Torino / IT | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 07425428.5 | 10.07.2007 | [2009/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2014499 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2014499 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/547, B60W10/10, B60W10/02, F16H3/08 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
B60K6/48 (EP);
B60W20/30 (US);
B60K6/547 (EP);
B60W10/02 (EP);
B60W10/08 (EP);
B60W10/11 (EP);
B60K2006/268 (EP);
B60K2006/541 (EP);
B60W20/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | Kraftübersetzungsanordnung eines Hybridfahrzeuges | [2009/03] | English: | Hybrid vehicle power transmission | [2009/03] | French: | Transmission de puissance dans un véhicule hybride | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 19.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.07.2010 | BE | 07.07.2010 | CY | 07.07.2010 | CZ | 07.07.2010 | DK | 07.07.2010 | EE | 07.07.2010 | FI | 07.07.2010 | LT | 07.07.2010 | LV | 07.07.2010 | MT | 07.07.2010 | NL | 07.07.2010 | PL | 07.07.2010 | RO | 07.07.2010 | SE | 07.07.2010 | SI | 07.07.2010 | SK | 07.07.2010 | TR | 07.07.2010 | IE | 10.07.2010 | LU | 10.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | BG | 07.10.2010 | GR | 08.10.2010 | ES | 18.10.2010 | IS | 07.11.2010 | PT | 08.11.2010 | HU | 08.01.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 10.07.2010 | ||
LU | 10.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
HU | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 10.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
HU | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 10.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 10.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 10.07.2010 | ||
IT | 10.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 10.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002040818 (MARUYAMA TAIJI [JP]) [X] 1-13 * page 1 *; | [A]FR2822758 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1-3* figure 2 *; | [X]US2003104901 (FUKUSHIMA TATSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE10203514 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * |