EP2015528 - Messaging interface system for serving a message to a target system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services GmbH Herrenacker 15 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferrigno, Francesco Viale Lombardia, 31-20131 Milan / IT | 02 /
D'amora, Angelo Via Francesco De Pinedo, 22-00043 Ciampino-Rome / IT | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07425430.1 | 12.07.2007 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2015528 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2015528 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58, G06F17/30 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
H04L51/066 (EP,US);
G06F16/258 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | Schnittstellensystem zur Nachrichtenübermittlung zur Bereitstellung einer Nachricht für ein Zielsystem | [2009/03] | English: | Messaging interface system for serving a message to a target system | [2009/03] | French: | Système d'interface de messagerie pour servir un message dans un système cible | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 15.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.01.2011 | BE | 19.01.2011 | CY | 19.01.2011 | CZ | 19.01.2011 | DK | 19.01.2011 | EE | 19.01.2011 | FI | 19.01.2011 | HU | 19.01.2011 | LT | 19.01.2011 | LV | 19.01.2011 | MT | 19.01.2011 | NL | 19.01.2011 | PL | 19.01.2011 | RO | 19.01.2011 | SE | 19.01.2011 | SI | 19.01.2011 | SK | 19.01.2011 | TR | 19.01.2011 | BG | 19.04.2011 | GR | 20.04.2011 | ES | 30.04.2011 | IS | 19.05.2011 | PT | 19.05.2011 | IE | 12.07.2011 | LU | 12.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
TR | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
IE | 12.07.2011 | ||
LU | 12.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
IE | 12.07.2011 | ||
LU | 12.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
IE | 12.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 19.01.2011 | |
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 19.01.2011 | |
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1411446 (NOVELL INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - page 4, line 20 *; | [A]US6996589 (JAYARAM NANDAGOPAL MYSORE [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 3, line 4 * * column 4, line 27 - line 33 * * column 10, line 42 - column 12, line 17 * * column 14, line 51 - column 15, line 34 * * column 17, line 14 - line 20 ** column 18, line 24 - line 36 *; | [X]US7146614 (NIKOLS NICK N [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - column 3, line 14 * * column 5, line 6 - column 7, line 10 *; | [A] - YEN D C ET AL, "The impact and implementation of XML on business-to-business commerce", COMPUTER STANDARDS AND INTERFACES, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA. LAUSANNE, CH, (200209), vol. 24, no. 4, ISSN 0920-5489, pages 347 - 362, XP004366225 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 350, paragraph 3.1.1 - page 351 * * page 352, paragraph 3.1.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0920-5489(02)00019-3 | by applicant | US7146614 |