EP2055532 - Glove box of a motor vehicle with a door having an adjustable closed position [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fiat Group Automobiles S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli, 200 10135 Torino (TO) / IT | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Falagario, Angela c/o Fiat Group Automobiles S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli, 200 10135 Torino / IT | 02 /
Toppani, Nicolas c/o Fiat Group Automobiles S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli, 200 10135 Torino / IT | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 07425678.5 | 29.10.2007 | [2009/19] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2055532 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2055532 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60R7/06 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
E05B83/30 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, TR [2010/02] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Handschuhfach eines Kraftfahrzeugs mit einer Tür mit verstellbarer Verschlussposition | [2009/19] | English: | Glove box of a motor vehicle with a door having an adjustable closed position | [2009/19] | French: | Boîte à gants d'un véhicule à moteur doté d'une porte dotée d'une position fermée réglable | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 07.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | 23.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2013/14] |
Former [2012/03] | IT | 29.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1538288 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US6152512 (BROWN WILLIAM O [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE102004018811 (PIOLAX INC [JP]) [A] 1; | [A]US2005283943 (SHIN KWANG-SEOB [KR]) [A] 1 |