EP2075442 - Closed-loop electronic combustion control system for a diesel engine operating with premixed charge compression ignition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [2009/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tonetti, Marco c/o C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano / IT | 02 /
Pelassa, Michele c/o C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano / IT | [2012/36] |
Former [2009/27] | 01 /
Tonetti, Marco c/o C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano / IT | ||
02 /
Pelassa, Michele c/o C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano / IT | Representative(s) | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2012/36] |
Former [2009/27] | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 07425842.7 | 31.12.2007 | [2009/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2075442 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2075442 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02D35/02, F02D41/30, F02D41/40, F02B1/12 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
F02D35/028 (EP);
F02D41/3041 (EP);
F02D41/403 (EP);
F02D2200/025 (EP);
F02D35/023 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Title | German: | Elektronisches Verbrennungssteuerungssystem mit geschlossenem Regelkreis für einen Dieselmotor mit Kompressionszündung mit Kraftstoffluftvormischung | [2009/27] | English: | Closed-loop electronic combustion control system for a diesel engine operating with premixed charge compression ignition | [2009/27] | French: | Système de contrôle de combustion électronique en boucle fermée pour moteur diesel fonctionnant avec un allumage de compression de charge prémélangée | [2009/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 11.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.12.2007 | AT | 05.09.2012 | BE | 05.09.2012 | CY | 05.09.2012 | CZ | 05.09.2012 | DK | 05.09.2012 | EE | 05.09.2012 | FI | 05.09.2012 | LT | 05.09.2012 | LV | 05.09.2012 | MT | 05.09.2012 | NL | 05.09.2012 | PL | 05.09.2012 | RO | 05.09.2012 | SE | 05.09.2012 | SI | 05.09.2012 | SK | 05.09.2012 | TR | 05.09.2012 | BG | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.12.2012 | ES | 16.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | GB | 31.12.2012 | IE | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | LU | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | IS | 05.01.2013 | PT | 07.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
GB | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
LU | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
GB | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
GB | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1607609 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [Y] 1-13 * abstract *; | [Y]DE102005058820 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] - [0044] *; | [A]US6276334 (FLYNN PATRICK F [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 44, line 39 - column 45, line 24 *; | [A]DE10344423 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,8,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] , [0020] , [0024] , [0027] *; | [A]DE10344427 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] *; | [A]EP1424481 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0030] * | by applicant | US2002007816 | US6637404 | US6142119 | US2003230276 | US2002011240 | EP1607609 |