EP2017576 - Combined accelerometer and gyroscope system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konkuk University Industrial Cooperation Corp. Konkuk University 1 Hwayang-dong Gwangjin-gu Seoul 143-701 / KR | [2011/46] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Konkuk University Industrial Cooperation Corp. Konkuk University 1 Hwayang-dong Gwangjin-gu Seoul 137-753 / KR | ||
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states KONKUK UNIVERSITY INDUSTRIAL COORPERATION CORP 1 Hwayang-dong, Gwangjin-gu Seoul 143-701 / KR | ||
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states KONKUK UNIVERSITY INDUSTRIAL COORPERATION CORP 1 Hwayang-dong, Gwanjin-gu Seoul 143-701 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sung, Sang Kyung 107-1025, Woosung Apt. Bangbae 2-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-753 / KR | 02 /
Lee, Young Jae 219-1201, Daechi Apt. Gaepo-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-544 / KR | 03 /
Kang, Tae Sam 114-804, Gwanak Hyundai Apt. Bongcheon 3-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-755 / KR | [2009/04] | Representative(s) | Fritzon, Rolf, et al Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | Fritzon, Rolf, et al Kransell & Wennborg KB Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07445046.1 | 18.12.2007 | [2009/04] | Priority number, date | KR20070072411 | 19.07.2007 Original published format: KR 20070072411 | [2009/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2017576 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2017576 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2017576 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2017576 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/56, G01P15/14 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
G01C19/56 (EP,US);
G01P3/42 (KR);
G01P15/097 (EP,US);
G01P15/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/04] | Title | German: | Kombiniertes System mit Beschleunigungsmesser und Gyroskop | [2009/04] | English: | Combined accelerometer and gyroscope system | [2009/04] | French: | Système associé d'accéléromètre et de gyroscope | [2009/04] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 31.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2011 | BE | 15.06.2011 | CY | 15.06.2011 | CZ | 15.06.2011 | DK | 15.06.2011 | EE | 15.06.2011 | FI | 15.06.2011 | HU | 15.06.2011 | IT | 15.06.2011 | LT | 15.06.2011 | LV | 15.06.2011 | MT | 15.06.2011 | NL | 15.06.2011 | PL | 15.06.2011 | RO | 15.06.2011 | SE | 15.06.2011 | SI | 15.06.2011 | SK | 15.06.2011 | TR | 15.06.2011 | BG | 15.09.2011 | GR | 16.09.2011 | ES | 26.09.2011 | IS | 15.10.2011 | PT | 17.10.2011 | IE | 18.12.2011 | LU | 18.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | FR | 02.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
TR | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.12.2011 | ||
LU | 18.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.12.2011 | ||
LU | 18.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.12.2011 | ||
LU | 18.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/19] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 15.06.2011 | |
SE | 15.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001022107 (KATO MANABU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005]; figure 14 *; | [A]US6481283 (CARDARELLI DONATO [US]) [A] 1,2* paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0082]; figures 7,8 *; | [A]WO03014669 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 6, line 6 - page 7, line 2; figure 2 *; | [A]EP1359391 (L 3 COMM CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0079] * * figures 1,3,6 *; | [A]WO2004097431 (ANALOG DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 4, line 1 - line 29; figure 1 * | by applicant | US2001022107 | US6481283 | WO03014669 | EP1359391 | WO2004097431 |