EP1842691 - Device intended for cleaning and wringing painting rollers, up to four rollers simultaneously, or more, depending on the model, compatible with all types of rollers and not requiring the roller to be treated to be dismantled, even partially. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Questiaux, Jean-Francois Av. Des Combattants 68 5500 Dinant / BE | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/41] | Application number, filing date | 07447024.6 | 22.03.2007 | [2007/41] | Priority number, date | BE20060000207 | 03.04.2006 Original published format: BE 200600207 | [2007/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1842691 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B44D3/00 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
B44D3/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/25] |
Former [2007/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gerät zur Reinigung und zum Trocknen von Farbrollen für bis zu vier Rollen gleichzeitig oder mehr, je nach Modell, kompatibel mit allen Arten von Rollen und ohne jegliche auch nicht teilweise Montage der zu behandelnden Rollen | [2007/41] | English: | Device intended for cleaning and wringing painting rollers, up to four rollers simultaneously, or more, depending on the model, compatible with all types of rollers and not requiring the roller to be treated to be dismantled, even partially. | [2007/41] | French: | Appareil destiné au nettoyage et a l'essorage des rouleaux de peinture, jusqu'à quatre rouleaux simultanément, ou plus, suivant le modèle, compatible avec tous types de rouleaux et ne nécessitant aucun démontage même partiel du rouleau à traiter | [2007/41] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 11.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/41] | 26.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0154923 (MAJERCAK JAN [SK]) [A] 1-16 * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 27; figure - *; | [A]FR2707852 (CAUDEBEC THIERRY [FR]; LEFORT GILLES) [A] 1,9,16 * page 6, line 20 - page 10, line 34; figure - *; | [A]WO2005046389 (ESPOSITO ANNAMARIA [IT]) [A] 1,9,16 * page 3, line 32 - page 13, line 6; figure - *; | [A]FR2847494 (GUILLEMET JEAN LUC [FR]) [A] 1-16 * page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 25; figure - * |