EP1900585 - Device for testing pneumatically operated brakes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ÖBB - Technische Services GmbH Grillgasse 48 1110 Wien / AT | [2008/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holzner, Karl Rohrbacher Strasse 53 2100 Leobendorf / AT | 02 /
Kreuzinger, Josef Untere Wagramstrasse 25 3463 Eggendorf am Wagram / AT | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Itze, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Wilhelm Casati & Peter Itze Amerlingstrasse 8 1061 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Itze, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Wilhelm Casati & Peter Itze Amerlingstrasse 8 1061 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2009/26] | Casati, Wilhelm Patentanwälte Casati, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. Itze, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Amerlingstrasse 8 1061 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2008/12] | Widtmann, Georg Clusiusgasse 2/8 1090 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 07450154.5 | 10.09.2007 | [2008/12] | Priority number, date | AT20060001518 | 12.09.2006 Original published format: AT 15182006 | [2008/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1900585 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1900585 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1900585 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/22 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
B60T17/228 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Extension states | AL | 07.09.2012 | BA | 07.09.2012 | HR | 07.09.2012 | MK | 07.09.2012 | RS | 07.09.2012 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Prüfen von pneumatisch betätigbaren Bremsen | [2008/12] | English: | Device for testing pneumatically operated brakes | [2008/12] | French: | Dispositif de vérification de freins pouvant être actionnés de manière pneumatique | [2008/12] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 07.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.09.2013 | [2016/22] |
Former [2015/12] | AT | 10.09.2013 | |
Former [2014/46] | deleted | ||
Former [2014/20] | MC | 24.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4440015 (HANN DALLAS D [US]) [AD] 1* figure 3 *; | [AD]US4847770 (KANE MARK K [US], et al) [AD] 1 * column 4, lines 61-68; figure 1 *; | [AD]EP1103437 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * paragraphs [0029] - [0035]; figures 2,4 * |