EP1925537 - Assembly, in particular tilting assembly for a trailer, and trailer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pongratz Trailer-Group GmbH Köllach 50 8712 Proleb / AT | [2008/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pongratz, Herwig Bruckerstrasse 15 8712 Proleb / AT | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Miksovsky, Alexander Patentanwalt Miksovsky KG Bisamberger Strasse 19 2100 Korneuburg / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Miksovsky, Alexander Patentanwalt Miksovsky KG Garnisongasse 4 Postfach (POB) 32 1096 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2008/22] | Miksovsky, Alexander Patentanwälte Miksovsky & Pollhammer OEG, Währingerstrasse 3 1096 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 07450204.8 | 22.11.2007 | [2008/22] | Priority number, date | AT20060000827U | 24.11.2006 Original published format: AT 82706 U | [2013/10] |
Former [2008/22] | AT20060082720U | 24.11.2006 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1925537 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/023, B62D33/02 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
B60P1/04 (EP);
B62D33/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/22] | Title | German: | Aufbau, insbesondere kippbarer Aufbau, für einen Anhänger sowie Anhänger | [2008/22] | English: | Assembly, in particular tilting assembly for a trailer, and trailer | [2008/22] | French: | Structure, en particulier structure à bascule pour une remorque ainsi que remorque | [2008/22] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/30] | 07.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3108047 (DAUTEL EMIL GMBH CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-11 * figures 1-9 *; | [X]US1365084 (BOWER FRANK W) [X] 1-5,11 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US1686294 (RODEKOHR ARTHUR F) [A] 1,11 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR1175746 (TELEHOIST LTD) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005168004 (VANDEWINCKEL STEPHEN C [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US1365084 | DE3108047 |