EP2007120 - Universal electronic device with a hands-free module and/or a GPS navigation system and a Bluetooth module, especially for automobile vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BURY Sp. z o.o. Ul. Wojska Polskiego 4 39-300 Mielec / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Bury Sp.z.o.o ul. Wojska Polskiego 4 39 300 Mielec / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURY, Henryk ul. Wojska Polskiego 4 39-300 Mielec / PL | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Kaminski, Zbigniew Kancelaria Patentowa Al. Jerozolimskie 101/18 02-011 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Kaminski, Zbigniew Kancelaria Patentowa, Al. Jerozolimskie 101/18 02-011 Warszawa / PL | Application number, filing date | 07460013.1 | 19.06.2007 | [2008/52] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2007120 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/60, B60R11/02 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
H04M1/6091 (EP,US);
B60R11/0235 (EP,US);
B60R11/0258 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0078 (EP,US);
H04M1/0214 (EP,US);
H04M2250/02 (EP,US);
H04M2250/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Title | German: | Universelles elektronisches Gerät mit Freihandmodul und/oder GPS-Navigationssystem und Bluetooth-Modul, insbesondere für Fahrzeuge | [2008/52] | English: | Universal electronic device with a hands-free module and/or a GPS navigation system and a Bluetooth module, especially for automobile vehicles | [2008/52] | French: | Dispositif électronique universel avec un module mains libres et/ou systeme de navigation GPS et un module bluetooth, notamment pour véhicule automobile | [2008/52] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 10.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/25] | 06.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004106427 (COLLAVO ANDREA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0067] *; | [Y]US2005099547 (VITITO CHRISTOPHER J [US]) [Y] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]DE202006006812U (BURY GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0023] * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US2003068986 | DE10211444 | US2004106427 | WO2005029825 | US2005099547 | DE202006006812U |