EP2070768 - A portable electronic device holder, especially for a dashboard of a car [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BURY Sp. z o.o. Ul. Wojska Polskiego 4 39-300 Mielec / PL | [2010/19] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Bury Sp.z.o.o ul. Wojska Polskiego 4 39 300 Mielec / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bury, Henryk ul. Wojska Polskiego 4 39-300 Mielec / PL | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Kaminski, Zbigniew, et al Kancelaria Patentowa Al. Jerozolimskie 101/18 02-011 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Kaminski, Zbigniew, et al Kancelaria Patentowa, Al. Jerozolimskie 101/18 02-011 Warszawa / PL | ||
Former [2009/25] | Kaminski, Zbigniew Kancelaria Patentowa, Al. Jerozolimskie 101/18 02-011 Warszawa / PL | Application number, filing date | 07460037.0 | 12.12.2007 | [2009/25] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2070768 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2070768 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/02 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
B60R11/0235 (EP,US);
B60R11/0252 (EP,US);
B60R11/0258 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0005 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0056 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0082 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | Halter für ein tragbares elektronisches Gerät, speziell für ein Fahrzeugarmaturenbrett | [2009/25] | English: | A portable electronic device holder, especially for a dashboard of a car | [2009/25] | French: | Support de dispositif électronique portable, spécialement pour un tableau de bord de véhicule | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 27.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.05.2010 | BE | 12.05.2010 | CZ | 12.05.2010 | DK | 12.05.2010 | EE | 12.05.2010 | FI | 12.05.2010 | IT | 12.05.2010 | LT | 12.05.2010 | LV | 12.05.2010 | MT | 12.05.2010 | NL | 12.05.2010 | PL | 12.05.2010 | RO | 12.05.2010 | SE | 12.05.2010 | SI | 12.05.2010 | SK | 12.05.2010 | TR | 12.05.2010 | CY | 09.06.2010 | BG | 12.08.2010 | GR | 13.08.2010 | ES | 23.08.2010 | IS | 12.09.2010 | PT | 13.09.2010 | HU | 13.11.2010 | IE | 12.12.2010 | LU | 12.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | FR | 03.01.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
TR | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
IE | 12.12.2010 | ||
LU | 12.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
IE | 12.12.2010 | ||
LU | 12.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
IE | 12.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
IE | 12.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
IE | 12.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
IE | 12.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 12.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1048968 (ECIA EQUIP COMPOSANTS IND AUTO [FR]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]JP2003220896 (OGAKI KENJI) [A] 1* figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE202005019023U (BUCHHALTER THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102006008420 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0039]; figure - *; | [A]JP2007269205 (YUPITERU IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US5187744 | DE29707123U | US6315255 | DE20313215U | WO2007100239 |