EP2118857 - A REMOTE LIVE GAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Playtech Software Limited 2nd Floor, St. Georges Court Upper Church Street Douglas Isle of Man IM1 1EE / GB | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMMESOO, Raul Soola 8 EE51013 Tartu / EE | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Peters, Hajo, et al ZACCO GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Peters, Hajo, et al Zacco GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | Herbjörnsen, Rut, et al Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07700055.2 | 11.01.2007 | [2009/47] | WO2007IB50090 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008084336 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2118857 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/32 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
G07F17/3288 (EP,US);
G07F17/32 (EP,US);
G07F17/3293 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | FERN-LIVE-SPIEL | [2009/47] | English: | A REMOTE LIVE GAME | [2009/47] | French: | JEU EN DIRECT À DISTANCE | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.05.2013 | 02.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/34] | 12.04.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/34] | 15.05.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9714484 (MOLNICK MELVIN [US]) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0040313 (RAFAELI YACOB [IL]) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * page 20, line 30 - page 22, line 14 * * figures 20-22 *; | [X]US2002068635 (HILL OTHO DALE [US]) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005090304 (CRAWFORD JAMES T III [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0116] ** figures 13-22 * |