EP1973818 - CONVEYING APPARATUS HAVING A THRUST ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WRH Walter Reist Holding AG Arenenbergstrasse 6 8272 Ermatingen / CH | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REIST, Walter Schönenbergstrasse 16 8340 Hinwil / CH | [2010/01] |
Former [2008/40] | 01 /
REIST, Walter Schönenbergstrasse 16 CH-8340 Hinwil / CH | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2008/40] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 07700107.1 | 08.01.2007 | [2008/40] | WO2007CH00009 | Priority number, date | CH20060005606 | 13.01.2006 Original published format: CH 56062006 | [2008/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007079603 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1973818 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1973818 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65G35/08, B65G15/28 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
B65G15/28 (EP,US);
B65G35/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÖRDERVORRICHTUNG MIT SCHUBELEMENT | [2008/40] | English: | CONVEYING APPARATUS HAVING A THRUST ELEMENT | [2008/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT DOTE D'UN ELEMENT DE POUSSEE | [2008/40] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09008958.2 / EP2110344 | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.04.2009 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 19.05.2010 | HU | 19.05.2010 | LT | 19.05.2010 | LV | 19.05.2010 | RO | 19.05.2010 | SI | 19.05.2010 | TR | 19.05.2010 | CY | 02.06.2010 | BG | 19.08.2010 | GR | 20.08.2010 | IS | 19.09.2010 | PT | 20.09.2010 | LU | 08.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | EE | 19.05.2010 | |
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
TR | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 19.08.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
LU | 08.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | EE | 19.05.2010 | |
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 19.08.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
LU | 08.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | EE | 19.05.2010 | |
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
LU | 08.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | EE | 19.05.2010 | |
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/25] | EE | 19.05.2010 | |
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3102153 (JURG STIELER, et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0488296 (HOPPMANN CORP [US]) [X] 1-10,15 * column 10, line 5 - column 11, line 49; figures 1-3,22-25 *; | [A]DE20205069U (KRONES AG [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |