EP1974574 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR USE IN SWITCHING COMMUNICATION OPERATIONS BETWEEN A WIRELESS WIDE AREA NETWORK AND A WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PECEN, Mark, E. 333 Old Post Road Waterloo, Ontario N2L 5P3 / CA | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07701687.1 | 15.01.2007 | [2008/40] | WO2007CA00056 | Priority number, date | US20060335807 | 18.01.2006 Original published format: US 335807 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007082368 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1974574 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1974574 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 26.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/04 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
H04W36/008375 (EP,US);
H04W36/14 (US);
H04W36/1446 (EP);
H04W36/32 (US);
H04W36/326 (EP);
H04W36/36 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/40] | H04Q7/38, H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Extension states | AL | 10.07.2008 | BA | 10.07.2008 | HR | 10.07.2008 | MK | 10.07.2008 | RS | 10.07.2008 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN SCHALTKOMMUNIKATIONSOPERATIONEN ZWISCHEN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN WEITBEREICHSNETZWERK UND EINEM DRAHTLOSEN LAN | [2008/40] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR USE IN SWITCHING COMMUNICATION OPERATIONS BETWEEN A WIRELESS WIDE AREA NETWORK AND A WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORK | [2008/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS LA COMMUTATION DES OPERATIONS DE TRANSMISSION ENTRE UN RÉSEAU ÉTENDU SANS FIL ET UN RÉSEAU LOCAL SANS FIL | [2008/40] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 10.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 03.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11161234.7 / EP2339879 | EP11180979.4 / EP2439982 | EP11180980.2 / EP2458917 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.01.2007 | AT | 07.12.2011 | BE | 07.12.2011 | CY | 07.12.2011 | CZ | 07.12.2011 | DK | 07.12.2011 | EE | 07.12.2011 | FI | 07.12.2011 | IT | 07.12.2011 | LT | 07.12.2011 | LV | 07.12.2011 | NL | 07.12.2011 | PL | 07.12.2011 | RO | 07.12.2011 | SE | 07.12.2011 | SI | 07.12.2011 | SK | 07.12.2011 | TR | 07.12.2011 | IE | 15.01.2012 | LU | 15.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | BG | 07.03.2012 | GR | 08.03.2012 | ES | 18.03.2012 | IS | 07.04.2012 | PT | 09.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 15.01.2012 | ||
LU | 15.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 15.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 15.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 15.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 15.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 07.12.2011 | |
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 07.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9731496 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 30 * * page 8, lines 28-36 *; | [A]EP1231805 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0023]; claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP1596564 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [A] 8 * abstract ** paragraphs [0115] - [0117]; figure 5 * | International search | [A]US2005197156 (FOURQUIN XAVIER [FR], et al); | [A]WO2005104587 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [X]WO2005107312 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al); | [Y]EP1596564 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) | by applicant | WO9731496 | EP1231805 |