EP1973350 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING INTERPOLATION IN SCALABLE IN VIDEO COMPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | 14.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Lu Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong Province 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Cixun Huawei Administration Building, bantian, Longgang District; Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
SUN, Qichao Huawei Administration Building, bantian, Longgang District; Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
XIONG, Lianhuan Huawei Administration Building, bantian, Longgang District; Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/39] | 01 /
YU, Lu Huawei Administration Building, bantian, Longgang District; Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHANG, Cixun Huawei Administration Building, bantian, Longgang District; Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
SUN, Qichao Huawei Administration Building, bantian, Longgang District; Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
04 /
XIONG, Lianhuan Huawei Administration Building, bantian, Longgang District; Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Dessauerstrasse 3 80992 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/43] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Anwaltskanzlei Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 07702051.9 | 11.01.2007 | [2008/39] | WO2007CN00119 | Priority number, date | CN2006148983 | 11.01.2006 Original published format: CN200610048983 | [2008/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007079693 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | ZH | [2007/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1973350 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/46 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
H04N19/34 (EP,US);
H04N19/80 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/186 (EP,US);
H04N19/30 (KR);
H04N19/33 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR INTERPOLATION BEI SKALIERBARER VIDEOKOMPRIMIERUNG | [2008/39] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING INTERPOLATION IN SCALABLE IN VIDEO COMPRESSION | [2008/39] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'INTERPOLATION UTILISANT LA COMPRESSION DE VIDEO EXTENSIBLE | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2008 | Translation filed | 16.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 03.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/51] | 11.11.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.11.2014 | 12.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP14192533.9 / EP2914007 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - YING C ET AL, "New downsampling and upsampling processes for chroma samples in SVC spatial scalability", ITU STUDY GROUP 16 - VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP -ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), XX, XX, (20050529), no. JVT-O077r1, pages 1 - 7, XP030006020 [X] 1-5,8,9 * page 2 - page 3 * | [IY] - SUN S, "New results on Direct Interpolation for Upsampling in ESS", ITU STUDY GROUP 16 - VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP -ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), XX, XX, (20051011), no. JVT-Q038, XP030006201 [I] 8-10 * section 1 * * the table on page 3 * [Y] 6,7 | [XY] - XIONG L, "Spatial upsampling filter", ITU STUDY GROUP 16 - VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP -ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), XX, XX, (20051011), no. JVT-Q051, pages 1 - 6, XP030006212 [X] 1,3 * abstract * * sections 1 and 2 * [Y] 6,7 | [XPI] - C-X ZHANG ET AL, "New results on Simplification of Up-sampling process of IntraBL mode", ITU STUDY GROUP 16 - VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP -ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), XX, XX, (20060115), no. JVT-R065, pages 1 - 8, XP030006332 [XP] 1-9 * sections 1 and 2 * [I] 10 | [X] - C-X ZHANG ET AL, "Simplification of up-sampling process of IntraBL mode", ITU STUDY GROUP 16 - VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP -ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), XX, XX, (20051021), no. JVT-Q078r1, pages 1 - 10, XP030006237 [X] 1,8 * abstract * | [X] - JVT, "Core experiment 7: Enhancement layer intra prediction", ITU STUDY GROUP 16 - VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP -ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), XX, XX, (20050701), no. JVT-O307r1, pages 1 - 6, XP030006035 [X] 1,8 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 9 * | International search | [A]JPH0993486 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]US2003190092 (DYAS ROBERT M [US], et al); | [A]US2004032535 (OGAWA HIDEAKI [JP]) | by applicant | - "New downsampling and upsampling processes for chroma samples in SVC spatial scalability", ITU STUDY GROUP 16-VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP-ISO/IEC MPEG&IUT-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTCI/EC29/WGL AND ITU-T SG 16 Q6, (20050529), pages 1 - 7 | - "Spatial upsampling filter", ITU STUDY GROUP 16-GIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP-ISO/IEC MPEG&ITU-T VCEG (ISO/IEC JTCL/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6, (20051011), pages 1 - 6 | - "Simplification of up-sampling process of IntraBL mode", ITU STUDY GROUP 16-VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP-ISO/IEC MPEG&ITU-T VCEG (ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6, (20051021), pages 1 - 10 |