EP1979417 - DISPERSING AGENT FOR AQUEOUS PIGMENT PREPARATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BVI) Limited Citco Building Wickhams Cay P.O. Box 662 Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHRENS, Hendrik Neu-Zeilsheim 89 65931 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
FECHNER, Björn Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 14 65817 Eppstein / DE | 03 /
BECHTHOLD, Uwe Kalbacher Hauptstrasse 38 60437 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2008/48] |
Former [2008/42] | 01 /
AHRENS, Hendrik Neu-Zeilsheim 89 65931 Frankfurt / DE | ||
02 /
FECHNER, Björn Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 14 65817 Eppstein / DE | |||
03 /
BECHTHOLD, Uwe Holzhausenweg 8 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE | Representative(s) | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent & License Management Chemicals Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 07702645.8 | 10.01.2007 | [2008/42] | WO2007EP00141 | Priority number, date | DE20061002800 | 20.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006002800 | [2008/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007087961 | Date: | 09.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1979417 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/04, C09B67/46, C09C1/24, C09C1/56, C09C3/10, C08G65/06, C08G65/08, C08G65/26, C08G65/329, C11D1/722 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
C09C3/10 (EP,US);
C08G65/26 (EP,US);
C08G65/2609 (EP,US);
C08G65/2624 (EP,US);
C08G65/329 (EP,US);
C09B67/009 (EP,US);
C09C1/22 (EP,US);
C09C1/24 (EP,US);
C09C1/56 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DISPERGIERMITTEL FÜR WÄSSRIGE PIGMENTPRÄPARATIONEN | [2008/42] | English: | DISPERSING AGENT FOR AQUEOUS PIGMENT PREPARATIONS | [2008/42] | French: | DISPERSANT POUR PREPARATIONS PIGMENTAIRES AQUEUSES | [2008/42] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 18.06.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0197005 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 19 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0403718 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 19 * page 1, lines 1-22,36-43 * * page 1, line 49- - page 2, line 3 * * page 2, line 50 - page 3, line 1 * * compounds 6-8 * * claims 1,8 *; | [A]EP1167452 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]) [A] 17,19 * compound I ** claims 1,10-13 *; | [X]WO2004044035 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-19 * page 1, lines 6-30 * * page 3, lines 2-13 * * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 6 * * page 5, lines 13-16 * * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 12 * * page 9, lines 10-13 * * page 12, lines 3-6,23-29 * * examples 16-22 * * compounds I, II, 10-13 * * claims 1-5,8 * |