EP1893453 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A GAS GENERATOR, AND GAS GENERATOR PRODUCED USING THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takata-Petri AG Bahnweg 1 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÄGER, Stefan Lessingstrasse 20 73557 Mutlangen / DE | 02 /
DIRNBERGER, Thomas Dörrmorsbacher Strasse 62 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | 03 /
DERVYN, Christophe Kronthaler Weg 9 65824 Schwalbach / DE | [2008/47] |
Former [2008/10] | 01 /
JÄGER, Stefan Aspergstrasse 22 70186 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02 /
DIRNBERGER, Thomas Dörrmorsbacher Strasse 62 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | |||
03 /
DERVYN, Christophe Kronthaler Weg 9 65824 Schwalbach / DE | Representative(s) | Baumgärtel, Gunnar, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Baumgärtel, Gunnar, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2008/10] | Baumgärtel, Gunnar, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 07702730.8 | 12.01.2007 | [2008/10] | WO2007EP00257 | Priority number, date | DE20061002435 | 12.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006002435 | [2008/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007082689 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1893453 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1893453 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/264, B60R21/26 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
B60R21/2644 (EP,US);
B60R2021/26029 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49925 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2008/47] |
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GASGENERATORS UND MITTELS DES VERFAHRENS HERGESTELLTER GASGENERATOR | [2008/10] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A GAS GENERATOR, AND GAS GENERATOR PRODUCED USING THE METHOD | [2008/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN GENERATEUR DE GAZ ET GENERATEUR DE GAZ FABRIQUE AU MOYEN DU PROCEDE | [2008/10] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 30.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 06.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 19.02.2009 | [2010/05] | Cited in | International search | [A]US6029994 (PEROTTO CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [A] 1-54 * abstract *; | [A]US6634302 (RINK KARL K [US], et al) [A] 1-54 * abstract *; | [A]US2006001246 (GOTOH YUZO [JP], et al) [A] 1-54 * figure 4 *; | [A]WO2005118356 (AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LAB [US]) [A] 1-54 * abstract *; | [A]DE60008844T (GIAT IND SA [FR]) [A] 1-54 * paragraph [0064]; figure 1a *; | [A]DE19954875 (TRW INC [US]) [A] 1-54 * abstract * | by applicant | US6029994 |