EP1974413 - DIRECT-OXIDATION FUEL CELL WITH PASSIVE FUEL SUPPLY AND METHOD FOR ITS OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | For all designated states Albert-Ludwigs-Universität Freiburg Fahnenbergplatz 79085 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Albert-Ludwigs-Universität Freiburg Fahnenbergplatz 79085 Freiburg / DE | |||
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Albert-Ludwigs-Universität Freiburg Fahnenbergplatz 79085 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECCARIUS, Steffen Lehener Strasse 156 79106 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
LITTERST, Christian Gutleustrasse 3 79115 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
KOLTAY, Peter Benzhauser Strasse 5 79232 Holzhausen / DE | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Riepe, Hans-Gerd Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Riepe, Hans-Gerd Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 D-80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07702934.6 | 22.01.2007 | [2008/40] | WO2007EP00518 | Priority number, date | DE20061002926 | 20.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006002926 | [2008/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007085402 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1974413 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/10 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
H01M8/04291 (EP,US);
H01M8/04186 (EP,US);
H01M8/04194 (EP,US);
H01M8/1011 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/09] |
Former [2008/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIREKTOXIDATIONSBRENNSTOFFZELLE MIT PASSIVER BRENNSTOFFZUFÜHRUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN BETREIBEN | [2008/40] | English: | DIRECT-OXIDATION FUEL CELL WITH PASSIVE FUEL SUPPLY AND METHOD FOR ITS OPERATION | [2008/40] | French: | CELLULE A COMBUSTIBLE A OXYDATION DIRECTE DOTEE D'UN APPORT PASSIF DE COMBUSTIBLE ET PROCEDE POUR SON UTILISATION | [2008/40] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 21.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/17] | 20.03.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.03.2012 | 22.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003077505 (YUASA BATTERY CO LTD) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2004152561 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 3 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1513213 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,4,7-11,15,18,20,22,23 * paragraphs [0010] , [0015] , [0020] , [0024] - [0030] - [0038] - [0042]; figure 2B *; | [A]EP1513210 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-26 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0024] - [0027] - [0046] - [0055]; figures 2,6,7 *; | [A]US2005089743 (LEE SEUNG-JAE [KR]) [A] 1-26 * paragraphs [0017] , [0040] - [0049]; figures 4,6 *; | [A]JP2005129261 (YUASA BATTERY CO LTD) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2005135811 (YUASA BATTERY CO LTD) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2005235519 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [XY]US2006003196 (KOHNO RYUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-11,13-23,25,26 * paragraphs [0055] - [0064] - [0068] - [0075] - [0081] - [0095]; figures 1A-1C * [Y] 3 |