EP1976881 - CHIMERIC AND HUMANISED ANTI-HUMAN IL-13 ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHMAN, Claire GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 02 /
CASSIDY, Martin, John c/o GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 03 /
CLARKSON, Jane, Elizabeth GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 04 /
ELLIS, Jonathan, Henry GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 05 /
WATTAM, Trevor, Anthony, Kenneth GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Lucy Rose GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Hitchcock, Lucy Rose GlaxoSmithKline 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07703766.1 | 10.01.2007 | [2008/41] | WO2007EP50219 | Priority number, date | GB20060000488 | 11.01.2006 Original published format: GB 0600488 | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007080174 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1976881 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/24 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
C07K16/244 (EP);
C07K16/24 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P33/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C12N5/10 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP);
C07K2317/24 (EP);
C07K2317/34 (EP);
C07K2317/56 (EP);
C07K2317/565 (EP);
C07K2317/73 (EP);
C07K2317/76 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 09.07.2008 | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIMÄRE UND HUMANISIERTE ANTI-HUMAN-IL-13-ANTIKÖRPER | [2008/41] | English: | CHIMERIC AND HUMANISED ANTI-HUMAN IL-13 ANTIBODIES | [2008/41] | French: | ANTICORPS CHIMERIQUES ET HUMANISES DIRIGES CONTRE L'IL-13 HUMAINE | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 15.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/16] | 30.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004019975 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-46 * abstract * * page 10, line 4 - line 14 * * page 17, line 27 - line 31 * * figures 22,30-37 * * examples 3-5 *; | [X]WO2004096849 (UNIV MANITOBA [CA], et al) [X] 1-46 * abstract * * page 4, line 4 - page 6, line 3 * * page 9, line 33 - page 10, line 30 * * figures 7,8 * * example 2 *; | [X]WO2005062967 (TANOX INC [US], et al) [X] 1-46 * abstract * * paragraph [0081] * * examples 1-11 *; | [PX]WO2006003407 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-46 * abstract * * figures 1-17 * * examples 1-8 *; | [PX]US2006073148 (TCHISTIAKOVA LIOUDMILA [US], et al) [PX] 1-46 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0023] ** examples 1-21 * | Examination | WO2004019975 | WO2004096849 | WO2005062967 | WO2006003407 | US2006073148 | - HOLT L J ET AL, "Domain antibodies: proteins for therapy", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20031101), vol. 21, no. 11, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 484 - 490, XP004467495 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2003.08.007 | - DAVIES J ET AL, "Affinity improvement of single antibody VH domains: residues in all three hypervariable regions affect antigen binding", IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, NL, (19960901), vol. 2, no. 3, ISSN 1380-2933, pages 169 - 179, XP004070292 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1380-2933(96)00045-0 |