EP1989406 - CYLINDER HEAD OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE HAVING AN ELECTROHYDRAULIC VALVE CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR, GB | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PROSCHKO, Markus Mönchsberg 17 91460 Baudenbach / DE | [2008/46] | Application number, filing date | 07704057.4 | 22.01.2007 | [2008/46] | WO2007EP50589 | Priority number, date | DE20061008676 | 24.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006008676 | [2008/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007098994 | Date: | 07.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1989406 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1989406 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F01L9/02 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
F01L9/14 (EP,US);
F01L9/00 (KR);
F01L2001/34446 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2009/12] |
Former [2008/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZYLINDERKOPF EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT ELEKTROHYDRAULISCHER VENTILSTEUERUNG | [2008/46] | English: | CYLINDER HEAD OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE HAVING AN ELECTROHYDRAULIC VALVE CONTROLLER | [2008/46] | French: | TETE DE CYLINDRE POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A COMMANDE ELECTROHYDRAULIQUE DES SOUPAPES | [2008/46] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 03.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 22.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.09.2013 | SE | 04.09.2013 | GB | 22.01.2014 | FR | 31.01.2014 | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/38] | IT | 04.09.2013 | |
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | SE | 04.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB127676 (ARMSTRONG W G WHITWORTH & CO, et al) [A] 1,12 * page 1, lines 5-9 * * page 3, lines 31-42 * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB350157 (ALEXANDER MAYER) [A] 1,12 * page 1, line 101 - page 2, line 19 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE3300763 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,12 * page 8, paragraph 4 * * page 9, paragraphs 1-3 ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0446065 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,12 * column 1, lines 2-6 * * column 6, line 33 - column 7, line 22 * * column 7, lines 47-54 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]JPH0726923 (ZEXEL CORP) [A] 1,2,5,12 * paragraph [0023] * * figure 1 *; | [DA]EP1338764 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [DA] 1-3,12 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0015] * * figure - *; | [A]EP1508676 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [A] 1,3,4,12 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0008] * * figures 1-3 * |