EP1986987 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING ALKOXYPOLYOXYALKYLENE (METH)ACRYLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2009/04] |
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states Evonik Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 45 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIESLER, Uwe-Martin Wachtelweg 136 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
KNEBEL, Joachim Alsbacher Str. 11 64665 Alsbach-hähnlein / DE | 03 /
MESS, Brigitte Friedrich-lehr-strasse 2 64839 Münster / DE | [2008/45] | Application number, filing date | 07704228.1 | 30.01.2007 | [2008/45] | WO2007EP50875 | Priority number, date | DE20061008998 | 23.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006008998 | [2008/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007096228 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1986987 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/08, C07C69/54, C08F290/06, C08G65/26, C09K15/08, C09K15/20, C09K15/30 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
C08F283/06 (EP,US);
C07C69/653 (KR);
C07C67/08 (EP,US);
C07C69/54 (KR);
C08F290/00 (EP,US);
C08F290/06 (KR);
C08F290/142 (EP,US);
C08F290/144 (EP,US);
C08F290/148 (EP,US);
C08G65/26 (KR);
C08G65/2609 (EP,US);
C08G65/3322 (EP,US);
C09K15/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/08, C07C69/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALKOXYPOLYOXYALKYLEN(METH)ACRYLATEN | [2008/45] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING ALKOXYPOLYOXYALKYLENE (METH)ACRYLATES | [2008/45] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'ALCOXYPOLYOXYALKYLENE (METH)ACRYLATE | [2008/45] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 15.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/16] | 14.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5322960 (SAKAMOTO KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 11-15 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 9 * * column 2, line 30 - line 39 *; | [A]EP0765856 (RIEMENSCHNEIDER LUTZ [DE]) [A] 11-15 * page 4, line 45 - line 51 * * page 5, line 41 - line 47; example - *; | [A]FR2739850 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [A] 1-10,16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0976716 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-10,16 * column 2, paragraph 7 *; | [A]EP1086939 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 11-15 * page 2, line 48 - page 3, line 15 ** page 18 - page 20; example - *; | [A]WO0174736 (ATOFINA [FR], et al) [A] 1-10,16 * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 7 *; | [A]US6458956 (SUTORIS HEINZ FRIEDRICH [DE], et al) [A] 11-15 * column 2, line 13 - line 18; claim - * * column 14, line 8 - line 15 * * column 14, line 30 - column 19, line 65 *; | [A]WO03104301 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10,16 * page 5, line 16 - page 8, line 11 *; | [A]WO2004108795 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10,16 * page 4, line 41 - page 5, line 32 * |