EP1981929 - NOVEL POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states Ciba Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEBOTAREVA, Natalia 33, rue du Gehren F-68220 Hagenthal le Bas / FR | 02 /
PRÉTÔT, Roger General Guisan-Strasse 72 CH-4054 Basel / CH | 03 /
VAN DER SCHAAF, Paul Adriaan 1, Rue Du Muguet F-68220 Hagenthal-le-Haut / FR | 04 /
SCHÄFER, Thomas Weidweg 15 D CH-4410 Liestal / CH | 05 /
SCHMIDHALTER, Beat Dahlienstrasse 25 CH-4416 Bubendorf / CH | 06 /
MURER, Peter Hohestrasse 166 CH-4104 Oberwil / CH | [2008/43] | Application number, filing date | 07704259.6 | 31.01.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007EP50934 | Priority number, date | EP20060101542 | 10.02.2006 Original published format: EP 06101542 | EP20060120616 | 14.09.2006 Original published format: EP 06120616 | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007090773 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1981929 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1981929 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/00 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
C08G61/10 (EP,US);
C08G61/12 (KR);
C08G61/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08G61/02 (EP,US);
C08G61/122 (EP,US);
C08G61/123 (EP,US);
C08G61/124 (EP,US);
C08G61/125 (EP,US);
C08G61/126 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12528 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12556 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12771 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE POLYMERE | [2008/43] | English: | NOVEL POLYMERS | [2008/43] | French: | NOUVEAUX POLYMÈRES | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 27.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.2010 | BE | 22.12.2010 | CY | 22.12.2010 | CZ | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | FI | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | LT | 22.12.2010 | LV | 22.12.2010 | NL | 22.12.2010 | PL | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SE | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | CH | 31.01.2011 | IE | 31.01.2011 | LI | 31.01.2011 | LU | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | BG | 22.03.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | ES | 02.04.2011 | IS | 22.04.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
LU | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
LU | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0295676 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]WO9423333 (IGEN INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US5457564 (LEVENTIS NICHOLAS [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005014689 (COVION ORGANIC SEMICONDUCTORS [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005030828 (COVION ORGANIC SEMICONDUCTORS [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005106418 (KIM KYU-SIK [KR], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005156516 (WANG HAILIANG [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005104264 (COVION ORGANIC SEMICONDUCTORS [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document * |