EP1984480 - USE OF FUNGICIDES FOR INCREASING THE QUALITY AND OPTIONALLY THE QUANTITY OF OIL-PLANT PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANTIEGHEM, Herve, R. Mörikestr. 5 76297 Stutensee / DE | 02 /
BAUER, Matthias Krottenbacherstr. 78 90453 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
HAASE, Andreas Spelzenstr. 19 68167 Mannheim / DE | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2008/44] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07704319.8 | 01.02.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007EP50998 | Priority number, date | EP20060002296 | 03.02.2006 Original published format: EP 06002296 | [2008/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007090788 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1984480 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1984480 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C11B1/06, A01N43/653, A01N43/40, A01N37/50, A01P3/00, C11C3/00, C10L1/19, C10L1/222, C10L1/224, C10L1/23, C10L1/232, C10L1/233, C10L1/24, C10L1/28, C10L10/00, C10L10/12 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
A01N43/653 (EP,KR,US);
A01N37/50 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/54 (KR);
A01N61/00 (EP,US);
C10L1/19 (EP,US);
C10L1/2222 (EP,US);
C10L1/224 (EP,US);
C10L1/23 (EP,US);
C10L1/232 (EP,US);
C10L1/233 (EP,US);
C10L1/2335 (EP,US);
C10L1/2412 (EP,US);
C10L1/2418 (EP,US);
C10L1/2425 (EP,US);
C10L1/2456 (EP,US);
C10L1/28 (EP,US);
C10L10/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N43/40, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/653, A01N2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2008/44] | C11B1/04, C10L1/18, A01N43/653, A01N43/54, A01N43/40, A01N37/50, A01P3/00, A01G7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | HR | 03.09.2008 | RS | 03.09.2008 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON FUNGIZIDEN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER QUALITÄT UND GEGEBENENFALLS DER QUANTITÄT VON ÖLPFLANZENERZEUGNISSEN | [2008/44] | English: | USE OF FUNGICIDES FOR INCREASING THE QUALITY AND OPTIONALLY THE QUANTITY OF OIL-PLANT PRODUCTS | [2008/44] | French: | UTILISATION DE FONGICIDES POUR AUGMENTER LA QUALITE ET EVENTUELLEMENT LA QUANTITE DE PRODUITS OLEAGINEUX | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 16.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2007 | BG | 15.07.2015 | CY | 15.07.2015 | CZ | 15.07.2015 | DK | 15.07.2015 | EE | 15.07.2015 | ES | 15.07.2015 | FI | 15.07.2015 | IS | 15.07.2015 | IT | 15.07.2015 | LT | 15.07.2015 | LV | 15.07.2015 | MC | 15.07.2015 | NL | 15.07.2015 | PL | 15.07.2015 | RO | 15.07.2015 | SE | 15.07.2015 | SI | 15.07.2015 | SK | 15.07.2015 | TR | 15.07.2015 | GR | 16.10.2015 | PT | 16.11.2015 | AT | 01.02.2016 | GB | 01.02.2016 | IE | 01.02.2016 | LU | 01.02.2016 | BE | 29.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | FR | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 01.02.2007 | |
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
TR | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
AT | 01.02.2016 | ||
GB | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 01.02.2007 | |
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
AT | 01.02.2016 | ||
GB | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
AT | 01.02.2016 | ||
GB | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
GB | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
GB | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
IE | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 15.07.2015 | |
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 15.07.2015 | |
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 15.07.2015 | |
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 15.07.2015 | |
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 15.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03099010 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 17-19,23 * page 1, line 29 - line 33 * * page 6, line 20 - line 23 * * examples B1,B2 *; | [X]WO2004023875 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 17-19,23 * page 1, line 4 - line 7 * * page 25, line 31 - line 34 * * page 26, line 9 - line 14 * * page 26, line 28 - line 29 * * page 27, line 1 - line 7 *; | [A]WO2005014765 (PETROLEO BRASILEIRO SA [BR], et al) [A] 1-24 * abstract *; | [A]WO2005108533 (CARGILL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-24* abstract * |