EP1987027 - HETEROCYCLIC ANTIVIRAL COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states F.HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FELL, Jay Bradford 2901 Cormorant Place Longmont, Colorado 80503 / US | 02 /
MOHR, Peter 4000 Ravenna Place Longmont, Colorado 80503 / US | 03 /
STENGEL, Peter J. 1525 Cambridge Drive Longmont, Colorado 80503 / US | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Kjellsaa-Berger, Hanny F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP), 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | [2008/45] | Application number, filing date | 07704418.8 | 07.02.2007 | [2008/45] | WO2007EP51162 | Priority number, date | US20060774419P | 17.02.2006 Original published format: US 774419 P | [2008/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007093541 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1987027 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1987027 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/04 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
C07D417/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/5415 (KR);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D513/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HETEROCYCLISCHE ANTIVIRALE VERBINDUNGEN | [2008/45] | English: | HETEROCYCLIC ANTIVIRAL COMPOUNDS | [2008/45] | French: | COMPOSES ANTIVIRAUX HETEROCYCLIQUES | [2008/45] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 15.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.12.2010 | CZ | 15.12.2010 | DK | 15.12.2010 | EE | 15.12.2010 | LT | 15.12.2010 | LV | 15.12.2010 | PL | 15.12.2010 | RO | 15.12.2010 | SI | 15.12.2010 | SK | 15.12.2010 | TR | 15.12.2010 | LU | 07.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | BG | 15.03.2011 | GR | 16.03.2011 | IS | 15.04.2011 | PT | 15.04.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
LU | 07.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO03037262 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1-22 * page 23, line 19 - page 25, line 35; claims 1-19 *; | [AD]WO03099801 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1-22* page 33, paragraph 2 - page 35, paragraph 3; examples 1-166 *; | [PA]WO2006021340 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [PA] 1-22 * the whole document * |