EP1981953 - FLUID CATALYTIC CRACKING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIERICKX, Jan Lodewijk Maria Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
HADJIGEORGE, Georghios Agamemnonons 2402 Cypress Hill Sugar Land, Texas 77479 / US | 03 /
SCHAVERIEN, Colin John Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2008/43] | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J., et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 07704478.2 | 09.02.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007EP51262 | Priority number, date | US20060771646P | 09.02.2006 Original published format: US 771646 P | US20060772729P | 13.02.2006 Original published format: US 772729 P | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007090884 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1981953 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C10G3/00, C10G11/05, C10G11/18 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
C10G3/48 (EP);
C10G11/05 (EP);
C10G11/18 (EP);
C10G3/49 (EP);
C10G3/62 (EP);
C10G2300/1014 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] | Title | German: | FLUIDKATALYTISCHES BERSTVERFAHREN | [2008/43] | English: | FLUID CATALYTIC CRACKING PROCESS | [2008/43] | French: | PROCEDE DE CRAQUAGE CATALYTIQUE FLUIDE | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 14.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2039943 (MOBIL OIL CORP) [X] 1-11 * examples 14-17; claims 1,2,6 * * page 4, lines 4-11 * * page 6, lines 18-20 * * page 7, lines 62-65 *; | [A]GB2132222 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * examples 1,2; claim 1 * * page 1, lines 89-104 *; | [A]US2004152586 (OU JOHN DI-YI [US] ET AL OU JOHN DI-YI [US] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * page 6, paragraph 80 * * page 7, paragraph 95 * * page 8, paragraph 105 *; | [A]US5233109 (CHOW PENG W [SG]) [A] 1-11 * claim 1 * * column 2, lines 5-24,60-66 * * column 3, lines 33-36 *; | [A]DE3340711 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * claim 1 * |