EP2036379 - A METHOD OF PROVIDING MOBILITY INFORMATION IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG St.-Martin-Strasse 76 81541 Munich / DE | [2013/46] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PROCTOR, Toby, Kier 30 St Ann Street Salisbury Wiltshire SP1 2DP / GB | [2009/12] | Representative(s) | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 07705361.9 | 31.01.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007GB50047 | Priority number, date | GB20060002421 | 08.02.2006 Original published format: GB 0602421 | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007091103 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2036379 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
H04W8/04 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W8/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/12] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON MOBILITÄTSINFORMATIONEN IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2009/12] | English: | A METHOD OF PROVIDING MOBILITY INFORMATION IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2009/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À FOURNIR DES INFORMATIONS DE MOBILITÉ DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 23.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 31.01.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9921377 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [Y]EP1079649 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP1365612 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |