EP2139503 - COSMETIC AND DERMATOLOGICAL COMPOSITIONS BASED ON ALGAE EXTRACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/01] | NOVEL COSMETIC AND DERMATOLOGICAL COMPOSITIONS BASED ON ALGAE EXTRACTS | ||
[2010/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXINFINE S.A. 60, rue Duguesclin 69006 Lyon / FR | For all designated states Innovat Parc des Expositions Le Kram, BP N[deg] 1 Tunis / TN | For all designated states Girmaud, Jean Alexis 23 Avenue de l'Observatorie 75006 Paris / FR | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIMAUD, Jean-Alexis 23 avenue de l'Observatoire F-75006 Paris / FR | 02 /
GUTIERREZ, Gilles Chemin de Gorgerat 69450 Saint Cyr au Mont d'or / FR | [2010/36] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
GRIMAUD, Jean-Alexis 23 avenue de l'Observatoire F-75006 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
GUTIERREZ, Gilles 39, rue Lieutenant Colonel-Prévost F-69006 Lyon / FR | Representative(s) | Burtin, Jean-François, et al Cabinet Gefib c/o Sté Delpharm Immeuble Le Poversy Bât. B 6-8 rue du 4 septembre 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2010/17] | Application number, filing date | 07705468.2 | 26.01.2007 | [2010/01] | WO2007IB00177 | Priority number, date | FR20060000813 | 30.01.2006 Original published format: FR 0600813 | [2010/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007085946 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2139503 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2139503 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/02, A61K8/73, A61P17/00, A61K36/03, A61Q19/00, A61K9/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
A61K36/03 (EP,US);
A61K36/02 (EP);
A61K8/9711 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/02, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/03, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE UND DERMATOLOGISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF BASIS VON ALGENEXTRAKTEN | [2010/15] | English: | COSMETIC AND DERMATOLOGICAL COMPOSITIONS BASED ON ALGAE EXTRACTS | [2010/15] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COSMETIQUES ET DERMATOLOGIQUES A BASE D'EXTRAITS D'ALGUES | [2010/15] |
Former [2010/01] | NEUE KOSMETISCHE UND DERMATOLOGISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF BASIS VON ALGENEXTRAKTEN | ||
Former [2010/01] | NOVEL COSMETIC AND DERMATOLOGICAL COMPOSITIONS BASED ON ALGAE EXTRACTS | ||
Former [2010/01] | NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS COSMETIQUES ET DERMATOLOGIQUES A BASE D'EXTRAITS D'ALGUES | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 19.05.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 21.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 27.10.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 27.10.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.07.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 27.10.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 27.10.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.07.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 27.10.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 27.10.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.07.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.2010 | CY | 08.09.2010 | CZ | 08.09.2010 | DK | 08.09.2010 | EE | 08.09.2010 | FI | 08.09.2010 | GR | 08.09.2010 | HU | 08.09.2010 | IE | 08.09.2010 | IT | 08.09.2010 | LT | 08.09.2010 | LV | 08.09.2010 | NL | 08.09.2010 | PL | 08.09.2010 | RO | 08.09.2010 | SE | 08.09.2010 | SI | 08.09.2010 | SK | 08.09.2010 | TR | 08.09.2010 | BG | 08.12.2010 | ES | 19.12.2010 | IS | 08.01.2011 | PT | 10.01.2011 | LU | 26.01.2011 | BE | 31.01.2011 | CH | 31.01.2011 | LI | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
HU | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
TR | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
LU | 26.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
TR | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
LU | 26.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
LU | 26.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
LU | 26.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20020030141 ; | [A]FR2743723 (TEXINFINE SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AD]FR2774292 (INOVAT SARL [TN]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2803523 (TEXINFINE SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2811563 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AD]FR2838459 (COMBE PIERRE [FR]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 79, Database accession no. 2002-729354, XP002387191 & KR20020030141 A 20020424 (ENPRANI CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2743723 | FR2774292 |