EP1986902 - CONTROL APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUTA, Koichiro c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGUCHI, Katsuhiko Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
MASUDA, Eiji c/o Denso Corporation 1-1 Showa-Cho Kariya-City Aichi-Pref 448-8661 / JP | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07705645.5 | 23.02.2007 | [2008/45] | WO2007IB00440 | Priority number, date | JP20060048908 | 24.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006048908 | [2008/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007096756 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1986902 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/06, B60W20/00, F02D11/10, F02D41/00, F02D41/06 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
B60L58/12 (EP,US);
B60K6/445 (EP,US);
B60L1/003 (EP,US);
B60L50/13 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W20/15 (US);
B60W30/192 (EP,US);
F02D11/105 (EP,US);
F02D41/0002 (EP,US);
F02D41/062 (EP,US);
B60L2240/443 (EP,US);
B60L2240/80 (EP,US);
B60L2250/26 (EP,US);
B60L2260/26 (EP,US);
B60L2270/145 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
B60W2710/0605 (EP,US);
B60W2710/087 (US);
B60W50/12 (EP,US);
F02N11/04 (EP,US);
F02N2300/104 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/12] |
Former [2008/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2008/45] | English: | CONTROL APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2008/45] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2008/45] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 25.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/29] | 12.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10031438 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO [JP]) [X] 1-7 * column 6, line 68 - column 11, line 25 *; | [X]JP2002213279 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,6,7 * abstract *; | [X]US2002179047 (HOANG TONY T [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0034] - [0038] *; | [XY]JP2003003884 (DENSO CORP, et al) [X] 1,6,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] * * claims 1,4 * [Y] 2-5; | [Y]JP2004346781 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 2-5* abstract *; | [X]US2005261817 (KOENIG JOHN J [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0027] * | by applicant | JP2002339781 |